EP0369941 - Substituted alpha-pyrones and process for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1994 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.1995 [1995/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1990/21] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vratislav, Kvita, Dr. Vogesenstrasse 71 CH-4153 Reinach / CH | [1990/21] | Application number, filing date | 89810837.8 | 06.11.1989 | [1990/21] | Priority number, date | CH19880004224 | 15.11.1988 Original published format: CH 422488 | [1990/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0369941 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0369941 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0369941 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D309/38 | [1990/21] | CPC: |
C07D309/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/21] | Title | German: | Substituierte alfa-Pyrone und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1990/21] | English: | Substituted alpha-pyrones and process for their preparation | [1990/21] | French: | Alpha-pyrones substituées et procédé pour leur préparation | [1990/21] | Examination procedure | 10.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/21] | 10.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, Band 29, 1986, Seiten 1159-1163, American Chemical Society, Washington, US; W.A. BOULANGER et al.: "Structure-activity study of 6-substituted 2-pyranones as inactivators of alpha-chymotrypsin" |