EP0376884 - Pourable granulate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.1995 [1995/06] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
FR
GB
IT
LI
NL
SE
CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | For:DE
CIBA-GEIGY GmbH 79662 Wehr/Baden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | For:BE
CH
FR
GB
IT
LI
NL
SE
CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
CIBA-GEIGY GmbH D-79662 Wehr/Baden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwab, Heinz, Dr. Drosselweg 21 D-7867 Wehr / DE | 02 /
Fuhrmann, Udo Alemannenweg 3 D-7880 Bad Säckingen / DE | [1990/27] | Application number, filing date | 89810946.7 | 12.12.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | CH19880004715 | 21.12.1988 Original published format: CH 471588 | [1990/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0376884 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0376884 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/20, C09D5/03, C08K9/08, B01J2/00 | [1991/31] | CPC: |
C09C3/045 (EP);
C09D5/03 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/27] | B01J2/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/27] | Title | German: | Rieselfähiges Granulat | [1990/27] | English: | Pourable granulate | [1990/27] | French: | Granulat coulant | [1990/27] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 15.12.1989 | Examination requested [1991/34] | 05.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/06] | 14.09.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP62087237 ; | [X]FR2572986 ; | [X]FR2405983 ; | [Y]FR2150474 ; | [Y]EP0152372 ; | [Y]FR2402643 ; | [AD]EP0038292 | [Y] - DATABASE WPIL, abs.no.87-159761, Derwent Publi & JP-A-62087237 (ASADA SEIFUN KK, MIYOSHI KASEI) 21-04-1987, & JP62087237 A 00000000 |