EP0400255 - Electronic music stand unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitidieri, Antonio Piazza Dante 5 I-74100 Taranto / IT | [1990/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/49] | Representative(s) | Checcacci, Giorgio, et al Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia 20 20135 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Checcacci, Giorgio, et al Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia 20 20135 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1994/31] | Checcacci, Giorgio, et al PORTA, CHECCACCI & BOTTI s.r.l. Viale Sabotino, 19/2 I-20135 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 89830187.4 | 03.05.1989 | [1990/49] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0400255 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0400255 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G05B15/02 | [1990/49] | CPC: |
G10G1/00 (EP);
G09B15/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, NL, SE [1990/49] | Title | German: | Elektronischer Musiknotenständer | [1990/49] | English: | Electronic music stand unit | [1990/49] | French: | Pupitre de musicien électronique | [1990/49] | Examination procedure | 04.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/33] | 27.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.05.1990 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   29.06.1990 | 29.05.1990 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   29.06.1990 | 29.05.1990 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   29.06.1990 | 29.05.1990 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   29.06.1990 | 29.05.1990 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   29.06.1990 | 29.05.1990 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   29.06.1990 | 29.05.1990 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   29.06.1990 | 29.05.1990 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   29.06.1990 | 29.05.1990 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   29.06.1990 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.11.1991 | 01.06.1992 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.1992 | 27.04.1993 | 04   M02   Fee paid on   27.05.1993 | 31.05.1995 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.1995 | 31.05.1996 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.01.1997 | BE | 08.01.1997 | ES | 08.01.1997 | GR | 08.01.1997 | NL | 08.01.1997 | SE | 08.04.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 08.01.1997 | |
BE | 08.01.1997 | ||
ES | 08.01.1997 | ||
GR | 08.01.1997 | ||
SE | 08.04.1997 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 08.01.1997 | |
BE | 08.01.1997 | ||
GR | 08.01.1997 | ||
SE | 08.04.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | AT | 08.01.1997 | |
BE | 08.01.1997 | ||
SE | 08.04.1997 | ||
Former [1997/49] | AT | 08.01.1997 | |
BE | 08.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 08.01.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2282666 (CASTILLO J DEL [MX]); | [A]GB2035664 (THOMPSON R); | [Y]US4366741 (TITUS JOHN S); | [Y]GB2204440 (MAHON GEORGE) |