EP0343123 - Numerically controlled electro-magnetical needle selection device for three positions on circular-knitting machines with alternating movement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.1993 [1993/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Furia, Edoardo Via Volterrana 86 Loc. La Romola I-50020 S. Casciano Val Di Pesa Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/47] | For all designated states Furia, Edoardo Via Volterrana 86 Loc. La Romola I-50020 S. Casciano Val Di Pesa Firenze / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/47] | Representative(s) | Martini, Lazzaro Studio Brevetti Ing. Dr. Lazzaro Martini s.r.l. Via dei Rustici 5 50122 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/47] | Martini, Lazzaro Studio Brevetti Ing. Dr. Lazzaro Martini s.r.l. Via dei Rustici 5 I-50122 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 89830207.0 | 11.05.1989 | [1989/47] | Priority number, date | IT20110000094 | 17.05.1988 Original published format: IT 9411 | [1989/47] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0343123 | Date: | 23.11.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0343123 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D04B15/78 | [1989/47] | CPC: |
D04B15/78 (EP,US);
D04B9/36 (EP);
D04B9/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT [1989/47] | Title | German: | Numerisch gesteuerte elektromagnetische Nadelauswahlvorrichtung für drei Stellungen an Rundstrickmaschinen mit hin- und hergehender Bewegung | [1989/47] | English: | Numerically controlled electro-magnetical needle selection device for three positions on circular-knitting machines with alternating movement | [1989/47] | French: | Dispositif de sélection électromagnétique à commande numérique des aiguilles à trois positions pour métiers à tricoter circulaires avec mouvement alternatif | [1989/47] | File destroyed: | 16.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 07.05.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/01] | 07.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.06.1992 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2424190 (RIBLER ERICH); | [AD]US3972206 (MURESO VLADIMIR); | [A]DE2519896 (MAYER & CIE MASCHINENFABRIK); | [A]FR2343069 (WIRKMASCHINENBAU KARL MARX VEB [DD]) |