EP0399130 - Shutters with tiltable louver boards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/48] | Improvements in shutters with tiltable louver boards | ||
[1993/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazzocco, Antonio Via Vaccaro 1 I-67031 Castel Di Sangro / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/48] | For all designated states MAZZOCCO, Antonio Via Vaccaro 1 I-67031 Castel Di Sangro / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/48] | Representative(s) | Sarpi, Maurizio Studio Ferrario S.r.l. Via Collina, 36 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Sarpi, Maurizio Studio Ferrario S.r.l. Via Collina, 36 00187 Roma / IT | ||
Former [1990/48] | Sarpi, Maurizio Studio FERRARIO Via Collina, 36 I-00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 89830226.0 | 22.05.1989 | [1990/48] | Priority number, date | IT19880048004 | 23.05.1988 Original published format: IT 4800488 | [1990/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0399130 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0399130 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E06B7/086 | [1990/48] | CPC: |
E06B7/086 (EP);
E06B7/096 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/48] | Title | German: | Jalousien mit schwenkbaren Jalousieplatten | [1990/48] | English: | Shutters with tiltable louver boards | [1993/35] | French: | Volets avec lames de persienne inclinables | [1990/48] |
Former [1990/48] | Improvements in shutters with tiltable louver boards | Examination procedure | 27.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/33] | 29.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR LI LU NL SE | Licencee: | METALTECNICA S.p.a. S.S. 17, Km. 149 67031 Castel di Sangro (L'Aquila) / IT | Date: | 06.08.1991 |
Former [1991/39] | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | |
For: | all designated states | ||
Licencee: | METALTECNICA S.p.a. S.S. 17, Km. 149 67031 Castel di Sangro (L'Aquila) / IT | ||
Date: | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.09.1993 | BE | 01.09.1993 | DE | 01.09.1993 | GR | 01.09.1993 | NL | 01.09.1993 | SE | 01.09.1993 | GB | 22.05.1994 | LU | 31.05.1994 | [2000/04] |
Former [1995/19] | AT | 01.09.1993 | |
BE | 01.09.1993 | ||
DE | 01.09.1993 | ||
NL | 01.09.1993 | ||
SE | 01.09.1993 | ||
GB | 22.05.1994 | ||
Former [1994/32] | AT | 01.09.1993 | |
BE | 01.09.1993 | ||
DE | 01.09.1993 | ||
NL | 01.09.1993 | ||
SE | 01.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/26] | BE | 01.09.1993 | |
DE | 01.09.1993 | ||
NL | 01.09.1993 | ||
SE | 01.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/26] | BE | 01.09.1993 | |
DE | 01.09.1993 | ||
NL | 01.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | DE | 01.09.1993 | |
NL | 01.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/22] | DE | 01.09.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2607585 (HASHIMOTO EDWARD Y); | [AD]US2610371 (HITE DANIEL I); | [Y]FR1492403 (BETA ALUMINIUM PRODUCTS LTD); | [Y]EP0119369 ; | [A]EP0220355 (KIKAU SRL [IT]) |