EP0346306 - Baffle for an automatic heat protection of the controls on the front panel of a household cooking oven [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1992 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.12.1992 [1992/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMEG S.p.A. Via Circonvallazione Nord, 36 Guastalla (Reggio Emilia) / IT | [1989/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertazzoni, Roberto Via Maldotti, 2 I-Guastalla (Reggio Emilia) / IT | [1989/50] | Representative(s) | Adorno, Silvano, et al c/o SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | Adorno, Silvano, et al c/o SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 89830259.1 | 08.06.1989 | [1989/50] | Priority number, date | IT19880021387U | 08.06.1988 Original published format: IT 2138788 U | [1989/50] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0346306 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0346306 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0346306 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/36, F24C3/12 | [1989/50] | CPC: |
F24C15/36 (EP);
F24C3/124 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL [1989/50] | Title | German: | Schirm zum automatischen Wärmeschutz von Bedienelementen an der Frontplatte eines Haushaltsbackofens | [1989/50] | English: | Baffle for an automatic heat protection of the controls on the front panel of a household cooking oven | [1989/50] | French: | Ecran pour la protection automatique contre la chaleur d'un panneau frontal de commande d'un four ménager de cuisson | [1989/50] | Examination procedure | 23.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/13] | 17.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2879370 ; | [Y]US2350293 ; | [A]US3132638 ; | [A]FR1430981 |