EP0368812 - Method and apparatus for electrolyzing water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1994 [1994/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Permelec Electrode Ltd No. 1159 Ishikawa Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/20] | For all designated states Permelec Electrode Ltd No. 1159 Ishikawa Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimamune, Takayuki 3006-30, Honmachida Machida-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nakamatsu, Shuji 1384, Nakada-cho Izumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Sawamoto, Isao 3-12-20, Koyato Samukawa-cho Koza-gun Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Nishiki, Yoshinori 6-4-2, Shonandai Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1990/20] | Representative(s) | Pellegri, Alberto, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/20] | Pellegri, Alberto, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Puccini, 7 I-21100 Varese / IT | Application number, filing date | 89830427.4 | 29.09.1989 | [1990/20] | Priority number, date | JP19880244979 | 29.09.1988 Original published format: JP 24497988 | [1990/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0368812 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0368812 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C25B1/10 | [1990/20] | CPC: |
C25B1/13 (EP,US);
C25B1/04 (EP,US);
C25B9/73 (EP,US);
Y02E60/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die Elektrolyse von Wasser | [1990/20] | English: | Method and apparatus for electrolyzing water | [1990/20] | French: | Procédé et appareillage pour l'électrolyse de l'eau | [1990/20] | Examination procedure | 05.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/46] | 16.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0027146 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [X]GB1190352 (HAAS GEORG [DE]); | [A]US3592749 (GRANGAARD DONALD H) | [A] - BROWN BOVERI REVIEW, vol. 73, August 1986, no. 8, Bader, Switzerland; "Ozone generation by means of MEMBREL electrolysis: A process for treating ultra-pure water", pages 451-456 |