EP0364415 - Improved process and apparatus for the bending of flat sheets of glass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1995 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETA' ITALIANA VETRO - SIV - S.p.A. Zona Industriale 66050 San Salvo (CH) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/16] | For all designated states SOCIETA' ITALIANA VETRO - SIV - S.p.A. Zona Industriale I-66050 San Salvo CH / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sassanelli, Vitantonio 201 Corso Mazzini I-66054 Vasto CH / IT | 02 /
Pracilio, Francesco Via Porto I-66054 Vasto CH / IT | [1990/16] | Representative(s) | Bazzichelli, Alfredo, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra, 39 00186 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/16] | Bazzichelli, Alfredo, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra, 39 I-00186 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 89830432.4 | 06.10.1989 | [1990/16] | Priority number, date | IT19880048442 | 11.10.1988 Original published format: IT 4844288 | [1990/16] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0364415 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0364415 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0364415 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C03B23/03, C03B35/18 | [1990/16] | CPC: |
C03B35/163 (EP,US);
C03B23/03 (EP,US);
C03B35/161 (EP,US);
C03B35/165 (EP,US);
C03B35/18 (EP,US);
C03B35/181 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1990/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Biegen von Flachglastafeln | [1990/16] | English: | Improved process and apparatus for the bending of flat sheets of glass | [1990/16] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour le bombage de feuilles de verre plates | [1990/16] | Examination procedure | 06.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/40] | 12.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 13.04.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 13.04.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3978974 (MORRISSEY JACK D, et al); | [A]US4043783 (FRANK ROBERT G); | [A]WO8502392 (SHATTERPROOF GLASS CORP [US]) |