EP0344135 - Sun visor and lighting installation for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.01.1994 [1994/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Happich S.a.r.l. Rue de Grenoble F-57150 Creutzwald / FR | [1993/09] |
Former [1989/48] | For all designated states AUTOPART SWEDEN AB Box 66 S-782 00 Malung / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Svensson, E. Gunnar Dammgatan 1 S-782 00 Malung / SE | [1989/48] | Representative(s) | Kierkegaard, Lars-Olov, et al Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | Kierkegaard, Lars-Olov, et al H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 3137 S-103 62 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1993/09] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1989/48] | Hellbom, Lars Olof, et al H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, Box 3137 S-103 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 89850137.4 | 27.04.1989 | [1989/48] | Priority number, date | SE19880001631 | 29.04.1988 Original published format: SE 8801631 | [1989/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0344135 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0344135 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0344135 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B60J3/02 | [1989/48] | CPC: |
B60J3/0213 (EP);
B60Q3/252 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/48] | Title | German: | Sonnenblende und Beleuchtungseinrichtung für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1989/48] | English: | Sun visor and lighting installation for motor vehicles | [1989/48] | French: | Pare-soleil et installation d'éclairage pour des véhicules automobiles | [1989/48] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 14.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 12.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/02] | Request for further processing for: | 12.11.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 12.11.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.11.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.06.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]DE3814315 ; | [XP]DE3711570 |