EP0354888 - A stirrer for a cooking vessel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.1992 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.1992 [1992/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novlab Innovation AB Box 7 S-260 24 Röstanga / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/07] | For all designated states NOVLAB INNOVATION AB Box 7 S-260 24 Röstanga / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kempe. Robert Stenbocksstigen 9 S-243 00 Höör / SE | [1990/07] | Representative(s) | Mossmark, Anders Lennart, et al Zacco Sweden AB Torggatan 8 Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | Mossmark, Anders, et al Albihn West AB, Box 142 S-401 22 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [1990/07] | MacFie, W.R. Albihn West AB Box 142 S-401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 89850235.6 | 20.07.1989 | [1990/07] | Priority number, date | SE19880002879 | 12.08.1988 Original published format: SE 8802879 | [1990/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0354888 | Date: | 14.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A47J43/07, B01F7/16 | [1990/07] | CPC: |
A47J43/0711 (EP);
B01F27/84 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/07] | Title | German: | Rührwerk für Kochgefässe | [1990/07] | English: | A stirrer for a cooking vessel | [1990/07] | French: | Mélangeur pour récipient de cuisson | [1990/07] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/19] | 20.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/48] | 09.06.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR465827 (MONNIER ET DESJARDIN SOC [FR]); | [A]CH390493 (KESSLER WERNER [CH]) |