EP0337977 - High temperature stable, low solvent swelling thermoplastic elastomer compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED ELASTOMER SYSTEMS, L.P. 540 Maryville Center Drive St. Louis Missouri 63166-6735 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/35] | For all designated states ADVANCED ELASTOMER SYSTEMS, L.P. 540 Maryville Center Drive St. Louis, Missouri 63166-6735 / US | ||
Former [1989/42] | For all designated states Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis Missouri 63167-7020 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Patel, Raman 578 Sun Valley Drive Akron Ohio 44313 / US | [1989/42] | Representative(s) | Plucker, Guy, et al OFFICE KIRKPATRICK Avenue Wolfers, 32 1310 La Hulpe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/21] | Plucker, Guy, et al OFFICE KIRKPATRICK Avenue Wolfers, 32 B-1310 La Hulpe / BE | ||
Former [1991/35] | Bosch, Henry Monsanto Services International S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270/272 Letter Box No. 21 B-1150 Brussels / BE | ||
Former [1990/23] | Ernst, Hubert Monsanto Services International S.A. Avenue de Tervuren 270/272 B-1150 Brussels / BE | ||
Former [1989/42] | McLean, Peter Monsanto Europe S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 Letter Box No 1 B-1150 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 89870049.7 | 10.04.1989 | [1989/42] | Priority number, date | US19880179816 | 11.04.1988 Original published format: US 179816 | [1989/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0337977 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0337977 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0337977 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/08, C08L33/04, C08L77/00 | [1989/42] | CPC: |
C08L23/0869 (EP);
C08L77/00 (EP,KR);
C08L33/04 (EP,KR);
C08L77/02 (EP);
C08L77/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/0869, C08L2666/20 (EP);
C08L33/04, C08L2666/04 (EP);
C08L77/00, C08L2666/24 (EP);
C08L77/02, C08L2666/06 (EP);
C08L77/02, C08L2666/24 (EP);
C08L77/06, C08L2666/06 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/42] | Title | German: | Thermoplastische elastomere Zusammensetzungen mit niedriger Lösungsmittelquellung bei hoher Temperatur | [1989/42] | English: | High temperature stable, low solvent swelling thermoplastic elastomer compositions | [1989/42] | French: | Compositions thermoplastiques élastomères à faible gonflement par solvants à température élevée | [1989/42] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 11.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.01.1994 | CH | 19.01.1994 | GR | 19.01.1994 | LI | 19.01.1994 | LU | 30.04.1994 | [2000/04] |
Former [1994/46] | AT | 19.01.1994 | |
CH | 19.01.1994 | ||
LI | 19.01.1994 | ||
Former [1994/31] | CH | 19.01.1994 | |
LI | 19.01.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4310638 (CORAN AUBERT Y, et al); | [A]EP0234819 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [X]EP0258040 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) |