EP0366643 - Antimicrobial dithiocarbamoyl quinolones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/18] | Novel antimicrobial dithiocarbamoyl quinolones | ||
[2000/10] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.08.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2001 | Refusal of application | published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROCTER & GAMBLE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 17 Eaton Avenue Norwich New York 13815 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states Procter & Gamble Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 17 Eaton Avenue Norwich New York 13815 / US | ||
Former [1990/18] | For all designated states Norwich Eaton Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 17 Eaton Avenue Norwich New York 13815 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Demuth, Thomas Prosser, Jr. RD Nr. 4, Box 16 Norwich New York 13815 / US | 02 /
White, Ronald Eugene Star Route Box 214 South Plymouth New York 13844 / US | [1990/18] | Representative(s) | Nargolwalla, Cyra, et al Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | Nargolwalla, Cyra, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1990/18] | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 89870161.0 | 24.10.1989 | [1990/18] | Priority number, date | US19880261948 | 24.10.1988 Original published format: US 261948 | US19890418029 | 12.10.1989 Original published format: US 418029 | [1990/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0366643 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0366643 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/56, C07D471/04, C07D498/06, C07D513/04, C07D519/00, C07D487/08, C07D401/04, C07D498/04, C07D471/06, C07D513/06, C07D413/04, // C07D501/36 ,(C07D471/04, 221:00, 221:00),(C07D498/06, 265:00, 221:00),(C07D513/04, 275:00, 221:00) | [1991/49] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07D215/56 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,US);
C07D455/04 (EP,US);
C07D477/10 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
C07D499/00 (EP,US);
C07D503/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1990/18] | C07D215/56, C07D471/04, C07D498/06, C07D513/04, C07D519/00, C07D487/08, C07D401/04, C07D498/04, C07D471/06, C07D513/06, C07D413/04, // (C07D471/04, 221:00, 221:00),(C07D498/06, 265:00, 221:00),(C07D513/04, 275:00, 221:00),(C07D519/00, 487:00, 471:00),(C07D487/08, 209:00, 209:00),(C07D498/04, 261:00, 221:00), C07D471:04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/18] | Title | German: | Antimikrobielle Dithiocarbamoylquinolone | [1990/18] | English: | Antimicrobial dithiocarbamoyl quinolones | [2000/10] | French: | Dithiocarbamoyl-quinolones antimicrobiennes | [1990/18] |
Former [1990/18] | Novel antimicrobial dithiocarbamoyl quinolones | Examination procedure | 26.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/30] | 10.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2001/41] | 13.05.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/41] | Request for further processing for: | 07.03.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 07.03.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.03.1997 | Decision despatched | 31.01.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 01.02.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 26.02.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0191185 (DAIICHI SEIYAKU CO [JP]); | [X]EP0224178 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [X]EP0235762 (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK [JP]); | [X]EP0235676 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [X]EP0237955 (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK [JP]); | [XD]EP0266576 (BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]); | [XP]EP0304087 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) |