EP0337981 - Scraper for granular material and stones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.1992 [1992/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Austria Metall Aktiengesellschaft A-5282 Braunau am Inn / AT | [1989/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garnweidner, Peter Otto v. Lilienthalstrasse 32 A-5020 Salzburg / AT | [1989/42] | Representative(s) | Hain, Leonhard Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/42] | Hain, Leonhard, Dipl.-Ing. Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89890105.3 | 11.04.1989 | [1989/42] | Priority number, date | AT19880000939 | 11.04.1988 Original published format: AT 93988 | [1989/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0337981 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0337981 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/68 | [1989/42] | CPC: |
B60S1/68 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/42] | Title | German: | Abstreifer für körniges Gut und Steine | [1989/42] | English: | Scraper for granular material and stones | [1989/42] | French: | Dispositif pour faire tomber de la matière granulée et des pierres | [1989/42] | File destroyed: | 17.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 20.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/42] | 03.04.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/40] | 29.04.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 04.05.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR546017 [ ]; | DE3230936 [ ]; | [X]JPS60124504 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 9, Nr. 282 (M-428)[2005]9. November 1985; & JP-A-60 124 504 (KATSUO MIZUNO) 03-07-1985 |