EP0356415 - Backflushing pressure diffuser screens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.1995 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.01.1996 [1996/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kvaerner Pulping Technologies AB Box 1033 651 15 Karlstad / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/46] | For all designated states Kvaerner Pulping Technologies AB Box 1033 S-651 15 Karlstad / SE | ||
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states KAMYR AB Knud Dahls Vag Karlstad / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jacobsen, Finn Knud Dahls Vag Karlstad / SE | 02 /
Richter, Ole J. Knud Dahls Vag Karlstad / SE | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1995/03] |
Former [1990/09] | Haffner, Thomas M., Dr., et al Patentanwalt Schottengasse 3a A-1014 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 89890182.2 | 06.07.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | US19880233366 | 18.08.1988 Original published format: US 233366 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0356415 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0356415 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0356415 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D21D1/40, D21C9/04 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
B01D33/0315 (EP,US);
D21C9/04 (EP,US);
D21D1/40 (EP,US);
D21F1/66 (EP,US);
B01D33/033 (EP,US);
B01D33/39 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR [1990/09] | Title | German: | Drucksiebdiffusionsanlage mit Zurückströmung | [1990/09] | English: | Backflushing pressure diffuser screens | [1990/09] | French: | Diffuseur à tamis sous pression avec reflux | [1990/09] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/17] | 09.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2473343 (KAMYR AB [SE]); | [A]EP0055701 (KAMYR AB [SE]); | [AD]US4396509 (FOYN TORE [SE]); | [A]GB2159725 (KLIMATANK HOLDINGS LIMITED); | [YP]EP0317771 (KAMYR AB [SE]) | [A] - TAPPI JOURNAL, vol. 70, June 1987, pages 95-103, Norcross, CA, US; R.H. CROTOGINO et al.: "The principles of pulp washing" |