EP0369983 - Process and apparatus for the electrolytic production of a metal foil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maschinenfabrik Andritz Actiengesellschaft Statteggerstrasse 18 A-8045 Graz-Andritz / AT | [1990/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maresch, Gerald, Dr. Johann Straussgasse 41-47 A-2340 Mödling / AT | 02 /
Hula, Emil Hauptstrasse 35 A-2372 Giesshübel / AT | [1990/21] | Representative(s) | Köhler-Pavlik, Johann Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/21] | Köhler-Pavlik, Johann, Dipl.-Ing. Margaretenplatz 5 A-1050 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 89890287.9 | 02.11.1989 | [1990/21] | Priority number, date | AT19880002801 | 15.11.1988 Original published format: AT 280188 | AT19890002263 | 28.09.1989 Original published format: AT 226389 | [1990/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0369983 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0369983 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C25D1/04, C25D7/06 | [1990/21] | CPC: |
C25D1/04 (EP,KR,US);
C25D7/0614 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, SE [1990/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur elektrolytischen Herstellung einer Metallfolie | [1990/21] | English: | Process and apparatus for the electrolytic production of a metal foil | [1990/21] | French: | Procédé et installation pour la fabrication d'une feuille métallique par dépôt électrique | [1990/21] | Examination procedure | 09.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/36] | 10.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 20.04.1994 | SE | 20.04.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/23] | IT | 20.04.1994 | |
SE | 20.04.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 20.04.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4108737 (EHRHARDT JOSEF, et al); | [A]US4568431 (POLAN NED W [US], et al) |