EP0371080 - STRETCH FILM WITH AUXILIARY BAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.1996 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.1996 [1996/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J.C. PARRY & SONS COMPANY, INCORPORATED 1920 Halethorpe Farms Road Baltimore, MD 21227 / US | [1990/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARRY, John, C. 616 Cape McKinsey Road Severna, MD 21146 / US | [1990/23] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/23] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 89900130.9 | 23.11.1988 | [1990/23] | WO1988US04098 | Priority number, date | US19870125574 | 25.11.1987 Original published format: US 125574 | [1990/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8904759 | Date: | 01.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0371080 | Date: | 06.06.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0371080 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.06.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B32B1/00, B32B3/00 | [1990/23] | CPC: |
B32B7/04 (EP,US);
B32B2307/402 (US);
B32B2307/412 (US);
B32B2553/00 (EP,US);
Y10S428/906 (EP,US);
Y10S428/91 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24843 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24901 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24967 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31913 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/23] | Title | German: | ELASTISCHER FILM MIT HILFSBAND | [1990/23] | English: | STRETCH FILM WITH AUXILIARY BAND | [1990/23] | French: | FILM ELASTIQUE A BANDE AUXILIAIRE | [1990/23] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.1989 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.1989 | Search fee paid | 27.07.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.1989 | Examination requested [1990/23] | 19.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2434248 (WOLFF WALSRODE AG) | International search | [X]US4386124 (AKAO MUTSUO [JP]); | [X]US4499706 (SCHELLER ANDOR [US]) |