EP0394307 - CHAIR, IN PARTICULAR WORK OR OFFICE CHAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROEDER GMBH Roentgenstrasse 10/16 60388 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/44] | For all designated states ROEDER GMBH Roentgenstrasse 10/16 D-60388 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEUSCH, Siegfried Mozartstrasse 41 D-7310 Plochingen / DE | 02 /
KRATZ, Günter Im Zickzack 7 D-7311 Hochdorf / DE | [1990/44] | Representative(s) | Vogel, Georg Pat.-Ing. Georg Vogel Hermann-Essig-Strasse 35 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/44] | Vogel, Georg Pat.-Ing. Georg Vogel Hermann-Essig-Strasse 35 D-71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89900186.1 | 10.12.1988 | [1990/44] | WO1988DE00757 | Priority number, date | DE19873744365 | 29.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3744365 | [1990/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8906100 | Date: | 13.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0394307 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0394307 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A47C1/032, A47C7/40 | [1990/44] | CPC: |
A47C7/402 (EP,US);
A47C1/03255 (EP,US);
A47C1/03272 (US);
A47C1/03277 (EP,US);
A47C1/03294 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/44] | Title | German: | STUHL, INSBESONDERE ARBEITS- ODER BÜROSTUHL | [1990/44] | English: | CHAIR, IN PARTICULAR WORK OR OFFICE CHAIR | [1990/44] | French: | CHAISE, NOTAMMENT CHAISE DE TRAVAIL OU DE BUREAU | [1990/44] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.1990 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 24.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 27.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.03.1991 | 01.01.1992 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.01.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 01.09.1993 | AT | 10.12.1993 | LU | 31.12.1993 | [2000/06] |
Former [1995/29] | SE | 01.09.1993 | |
AT | 10.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/26] | SE | 01.09.1993 | Cited in | International search | EP0176816 [ ] (GIROFLEX ENTWICKLUNGS AG [CH]); | WO8300610 [ ] (GIROFLEX ENTWICKLUNGS AG [CH]) |