EP0354938 - MULTIPURPOSE, MULTIPOSITION RECLINING CHAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DIFFUSION UNIVERSELLE 9, route de Toul F-54840 VELAINE-en-HAYE / FR | [1990/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANTOINE, Alain Les Sèches-Tournées F-88230 Fraize / FR | 02 /
LEMAIRE, Gérard 26, boulevard Jean-Jaurès F-54000 Nancy / FR | [1990/08] | Representative(s) | Poupon, Michel Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon L'Escurial - Technopole de Brabois 17, avenue de la Forêt de Haye 54519 Vandoeuvre-Les-Nancy Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Poupon, Michel Cabinet Michel Poupon L'Escurial - Technopole de Brabois 17 Avenue de la Forêt de Haye 54519 Vandoeuvre-Les-Nancy Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1993/26] | Poupon, Michel B.P. 421 3, rue Ferdinand Brunot F-88011 Epinal Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1990/08] | Poupon, Michel B.P. 421 3, rue Ferdinand Brunot F-88011 Epinal Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 89900275.2 | 14.12.1988 | [1990/08] | WO1988FR00609 | Priority number, date | FR19880001096 | 27.01.1988 Original published format: FR 8801096 | [1990/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8906923 | Date: | 10.08.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0354938 | Date: | 21.02.1990 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0354938 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A47C1/034, A47C1/035 | [1990/08] | CPC: |
A47C1/035 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/08] | Title | German: | VERSTELLBARER STUHL | [1990/08] | English: | MULTIPURPOSE, MULTIPOSITION RECLINING CHAIR | [1990/08] | French: | FAUTEUIL MULTI-FONCTION ET MULTI-POSITION | [1990/08] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.1989 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.1989 | Examination requested [1990/20] | 22.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.04.1994 | IT | 13.04.1994 | NL | 13.04.1994 | SE | 13.04.1994 | CH | 31.12.1994 | LI | 31.12.1994 | LU | 31.12.1994 | [2002/23] |
Former [2000/06] | AT | 13.04.1994 | |
IT | 13.04.1994 | ||
NL | 13.04.1994 | ||
CH | 31.12.1994 | ||
LI | 31.12.1994 | ||
LU | 31.12.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 13.04.1994 | |
IT | 13.04.1994 | ||
NL | 13.04.1994 | ||
CH | 31.12.1994 | ||
LI | 31.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/44] | AT | 13.04.1994 | |
NL | 13.04.1994 | ||
CH | 31.12.1994 | ||
LI | 31.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/12] | AT | 13.04.1994 | |
NL | 13.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/02] | AT | 13.04.1994 | Cited in | International search | US4637652 [ ] (BERGENWALL HENNING [SE]); | EP0183630 [ ] (SALONS DIRECT USINE SA [FR]) |