EP0344273 - WRAP-AROUND ARTICLE CARRIER WITH END FOLD-IN PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.1994 [1994/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANVILLE CORPORATION Patent and Licensing Department P.O. Box 5108 Denver, CO 80217-5108 / US | [1989/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, Jerry Franklin 903 Parkwood Drive 404 W. Monroe, LA 71291 / US | [1993/40] |
Former [1989/49] | 01 /
WILSON, Jerry, Franklin 903 Parkwood Drive 404 W. Monroe, LA 71291 / US | Representative(s) | Grättinger, Günter Grättinger - Möhring - von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grättinger, Günter Grättinger & Partner Postfach 16 55 D-82306 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89900498.0 | 14.11.1988 | [1989/49] | WO1988US04050 | Priority number, date | US19870130031 | 07.12.1987 Original published format: US 130031 | [1989/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8905268 | Date: | 15.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0344273 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0344273 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.06.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65D65/12 | [1989/49] | CPC: |
B65D71/36 (EP,US);
B65D65/12 (KR);
B65D2571/00172 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00185 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00277 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00444 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/49] | Title | German: | RUNDUM-TRAGEVERPACKUNG MIT STIRNSEITIGEN FALTLAPPEN | [1989/49] | English: | WRAP-AROUND ARTICLE CARRIER WITH END FOLD-IN PANEL | [1989/49] | French: | EMBALLAGE ENVELOPPANT A PANNEAU TERMINAL REPLIABLE POUR TRANSPORT D'ARTICLE | [1989/49] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.1989 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.1989 | Search fee paid | 02.08.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/50] | 11.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3128010 (FORRER HOMER W); | [A]US3294280 (GRASER EARL J); | [A]US3398856 (GRASER EARL J); | [A]US3410397 (CATO CARL P); | [A]US3429496 (HICKIN ROBERT J); | [A]US3478951 (GRASER EARL J); | [A]US3977518 (ARNESON EDWIN L); | [A]US4328893 (OLIFF JAMES R, et al) |