EP0346424 - CONVERTER FOR CONVERTING A MULTIPLE PHASE VARIABLE FREQUENCY AC VOLTAGE INTO DC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1990 | Change - withdrawal | published on 16.01.1991 [1991/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUNDSTRAND CORPORATION 4949 Harrison Avenue P.O. Box 7003 Rockford Illinois 61125- 7003 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/51] | For all designated states SUNDSTRAND CORPORATION 4949 Harrison Avenue P.O. Box 7003 Rockford Illinois 61125- 7003 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NG, Chai-Nam 4118 Florida Drive Apt. 236 Rockford, IL 61108 / US | 02 /
DHYANCHAND, John, J. 2721 Pelham Road Rockford, IL 61107 / US | [1989/51] | Representative(s) | Serjeants LLP Dock 75 Exploration Drive Leicester, LE4 5NU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/51] | SERJEANTS 25, The Crescent King Street Leicester, LE1 6RX / GB | Application number, filing date | 89900534.2 | 23.11.1988 | [1989/51] | WO1988US04203 | Priority number, date | US19870128445 | 03.12.1987 Original published format: US 128445 | [1989/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8905541 | Date: | 15.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0346424 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.06.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/084 | [1989/51] | CPC: |
H02M7/1623 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/51] | Title | German: | UMWANDLER ZUM UMWANDLEN EINER MEHRPHASIGEN WECHSELSTROMSPANNUNG MIT VARIABLER FREQUENZ IN GLEICHSPANNUNG | [1989/51] | English: | CONVERTER FOR CONVERTING A MULTIPLE PHASE VARIABLE FREQUENCY AC VOLTAGE INTO DC | [1989/51] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR PERMETTANT LA CONVERSION D'UNE TENSION A COURANT ALTERNATIF A FREQUENCE VARIABLE A PHASE MULTIPLE EN UNE TENSION A COURANT CONTINU | [1989/51] | File destroyed: | 08.07.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.1989 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.1989 | Search fee paid | 26.08.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/51] | 16.10.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3849719 (GEIERSBACH A, et al); | [A]US4042873 (COX JAY ASHTON) | International search | [A]US3593105 (GROHAUGH PAUL D); | [A]US3683262 (NEUFFER INGEMAR, et al); | [A]US4050007 (GROSS HANS, et al); | [X]EP0017642 (ELIN UNION AG [AT]); | [X]JPS57117020 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]US4348718 (VOLLRATH DONALD E); | [X]US4385242 (WAGENER PAUL W); | [A]US4499534 (SCHNETZKA HAROLD R [US], et al); | [A]JPS6066672 (KOSHUHA NETSUREN KK) |