EP0363445 - A PORTABLE BELT MONITOR OF PHYSIOLOGICAL FUNCTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.1991 [1991/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN HEALTH PRODUCTS, INC. 1578 North Batavia Orange, CA 92666 / US | [1990/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALEM, Robert, Joseph 223 Holiday Point Road Sherman, Conneticut 06784 / US | 02 /
HOLLEY, George, H. 7 Twilite Place South Norwalk, CT 06854 / US | [1990/16] | Representative(s) | Targett, Kenneth Stanley, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | Targett, Kenneth Stanley, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | ||
Former [1990/16] | Thomas, Roger Tamlyn D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 89900743.9 | 30.11.1988 | [1990/16] | WO1988US04262 | Priority number, date | US19870128144 | 03.12.1987 Original published format: US 128144 | [1990/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8905116 | Date: | 15.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0363445 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.06.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/08 | [1990/16] | CPC: |
A61B5/0006 (EP,US);
A61B5/0205 (EP,US);
A61B5/1135 (EP,US);
A61B5/282 (EP,US);
A61B5/332 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/16] | Title | German: | TRAGBARER RIEMENMONITOR FÜR PHYSIOLOGISCHE FUNKTIONEN | [1990/16] | English: | A PORTABLE BELT MONITOR OF PHYSIOLOGICAL FUNCTIONS | [1990/16] | French: | CEINTURE PORTABLE DE CONTROLE DE FONCTIONS PHYSIOLOGIQUES | [1990/16] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.1989 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.1989 | Search fee paid | 08.08.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.1989 | Examination requested [1990/16] | 01.06.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/49] | 02.07.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1991/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2353268 (KECZELY LAJOS [FR]); | [Y]WO8200950 (LOTMAN H); | [A]WO8604497 (FLEXIGAGE LTD [GB]); | [A]FR2582392 (ZIE ANDRE [FR]); | [AD]US3187300 (BRATE DONALD C); | [A]US3910257 (FLETCHER JAMES C ADMINISTRATOR, et al); | [A]WO8301374 (HOEOEG ANDERS [SE], et al); | [A]GB2148617 (HIRSCH HERMANN) | International search | [A]US4129125 (LESTER ROBERT W, et al); | [A]US4576179 (MANUS EUGENE A [US], et al); | [A]GB1492875 (LEUNER H); | [A]GB2181555 (CLAY RICHARD ELWELL) |