EP0390849 - METHYL CELLULOSE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1993 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.1993 [1993/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE LIPOSOME COMPANY, INC. One Research Way Princeton Forrestal Center Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/41] | For all designated states THE LIPOSOME COMPANY, INC. One Research Way Princeton Forrestal Center Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESTIS, Leonard, F. 56 Grafton Road Upton, MA 01568 / US | 02 /
KEYES, Lynn, D. 56 Grafton Road Upton, MA 01568 / US | 03 /
RECINE, Marie, S. 19 Hoffman Drive Hamilton Twp., NJ 08690 / US | [1990/41] | Representative(s) | Warcoin, Jacques Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/41] | Warcoin, Jacques Cabinet Régimbeau, 26, avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89900745.4 | 30.11.1988 | [1990/41] | WO1988US04267 | Priority number, date | US19870128391 | 03.12.1987 Original published format: US 128391 | [1990/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8905149 | Date: | 15.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0390849 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0390849 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.06.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K37/02, A61K37/66, A61K31/70 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
A61K38/21 (EP);
A61K38/2013 (EP);
A61K47/38 (EP);
A61K9/0019 (EP);
A61K9/127 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1990/41] | A61K37/02, A61K45/02, A61K31/70 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/41] | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTEL MIT METHYLCELLULOSE | [1990/41] | English: | METHYL CELLULOSE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION | [1990/41] | French: | COMPOSTION PHARMACEUTIQUE A BASE DE CELLULOSE DE METHYLE | [1990/41] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.1990 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.1990 | Search fee paid | 28.05.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 29.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/41] | 05.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0177223 (MEZEI MICHAEL); | [Y]EP0225130 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) | International search | [Y]US4359483 (KAETSU ISAO, et al); | [Y]WO8301198 (BERG KURT FRIMANN [DK]); | [A]US4609546 (HIRATANI HAJIME [JP]); | [Y]US4680175 (ESTIS LEONARD F [US], et al); | [X]US4708861 (POPESCU MIRCEA C [US], et al); | [YP]US4717717 (FINKENAUR AMY L [US]); | [YP]US4762720 (JIZOMOTO HIROAKI [JP]); | [AP]US4762915 (KUNG VIOLA T [US], et al) | [Y] - Science, Vol. 236, issued June 1987; "The Human Hematopoietic Colony-Stimulating Factors", (CLARK), pages 1229-37, see pages 1235-36. | [Y] - Blood, Vol. 67, issued February 1986, "The Molecular Biology and Functions of the Granulocyte-Macrophage Colony-Stimulating Factos", (METCALF), pages 257-67, see pages 259, 262-64. | [Y] - Seminars in Oncology, Vol. 13, issued June 1986, "Future Perspectives for Biological Response Modifiers", (MIHICH), pages 234-54, see all. |