EP0394327 - CENTRAL CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1992 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANZ KIRSTEN ELEKTROTECHNISCHE SPEZIALFABRIK Franz Kirsten Strasse 1 D-6530 Bingen-Bingerbrück / DE | [1990/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBOLD, Ulrich Am Hahn 18 D-6534 Stromberg / DE | 02 /
KUHN, Heinz, J. Berliner Strasse 15 D-6531 Waldalgesheim / DE | 03 /
BUTZBACH, Karl, F. An der Kirchenpforte 6 D-6550 Bad Kreuznach / DE | 04 /
HILL, Manfred Am Schwimmbad 33 D-6530 Bingen / DE | [1990/44] | Representative(s) | Becker, Bernd Patentanwälte BECKER & AUE Saarlandstrasse 66 55411 Bingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/44] | Becker, Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Hauptstrasse 10 D-55411 Bingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89900793.4 | 30.12.1988 | [1990/44] | WO1988DE00783 | Priority number, date | DE19873744603 | 31.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3744603 | DE19883843972 | 27.12.1988 Original published format: DE 3843972 | [1990/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8906201 | Date: | 13.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0394327 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0394327 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02 | [1990/44] | CPC: |
B60R16/0238 (EP,US);
B60R16/02 (KR);
H05K1/144 (EP,US);
H05K7/026 (EP,US);
H05K1/0286 (EP,US);
H05K3/368 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/44] | Title | German: | ZENTRALELEKTRIK FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE | [1990/44] | English: | CENTRAL CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR MOTOR VEHICLES | [1990/44] | French: | CENTRALE ELECTRIQUE POUR VEHICULES A MOTEUR | [1990/44] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.1989 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 16.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 08.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0240453 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES AUTOMOTIVE [US]); | [A]DE3048451 ; | [A]DE3608752 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG); | [A]DE3439410 (STRIBEL GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE2836166 (KOSTAL FA LEOPOLD); | [A]DE3525085 (STRIBEL GMBH [DE]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Vol. 25, No. 4, September 1982, R.F. KILBURN and R.F. OLSEN, "Printed Circuit Module Assembly", page 1803. |