EP0352332 - VEHICLE NAVIGATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi 444-1192 / JP | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA SHINSANGYOKAIHATSU 33-3, Hatagaya 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/05] | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-11 / JP | ||
For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA SHINSANGYOKAIHATSU 33-3, Hatagaya 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOYAMA, Yasuhiro Aisin Aw Co., Ltd. 10, Takane Fujii-cho, Anjo-shi Aichi 444-11 / JP | 02 /
YAMADA, Takashi Aisin Aw Co., Ltd. 10, Takane Fujii-cho, Anjo-shi Aichi 444-11 / JP | [1990/05] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/05] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89900887.4 | 23.12.1988 | [1990/05] | WO1988JP01304 | Priority number, date | JP19870333058 | 28.12.1987 Original published format: JP 33305887 | [1990/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8906344 | Date: | 13.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0352332 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.07.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/00 | [1990/05] | CPC: |
G01C21/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/05] | Title | German: | NAVIGATIONSSYSTEM FÜR FAHRZEUGE | [1990/05] | English: | VEHICLE NAVIGATION SYSTEM | [1990/05] | French: | SYSTEME INDICATEUR DE ROUTE | [1990/05] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.1989 | Translation filed | 20.09.1989 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.1989 | Search fee paid | 20.09.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/14] | 04.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/25] | 25.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1993 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57199007 ; | [A]DE3307123 (TELEFUNKEN ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0120195 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]); | [A]DE3609288 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 51 (P-179)[1196], 26th February 1983; & JP-A-57 199 007 (KIYOTO FURUYA) 06-12-1982, & JP57199007 A 00000000 | International search | [Y]JPH05824999 ; | [Y]JPH05831373 |