EP0349626 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING HALL EFFECT SENSOR FOR MAGNETIC RECORDING HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.10.1995 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 13.12.1995 [1995/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUANTUM CORPORATION 500 McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | For all designated states QUANTUM CORPORATION 500 McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas California 95035 / US | ||
Former [1990/02] | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 146 Main Street Maynard, MA 01754 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALLARY, Michael 113 Boylston Road Berlin, MA 01503 / US | 02 /
BISAGNI, Christine 29 Gordon Street, 202 Framingham, MA 01701 / US | 03 /
LIU, Shu-Huei 42 Monroe Street Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US | [1990/02] | Representative(s) | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89901163.9 | 25.11.1988 | [1990/02] | WO1988US04206 | Priority number, date | US19870128947 | 04.12.1987 Original published format: US 128947 | [1990/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8906054 | Date: | 29.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0349626 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.06.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01L43/14 | [1990/02] | CPC: |
G11B5/3163 (EP,US);
H10N52/01 (EP,US);
G11B5/374 (EP,US);
G11B5/376 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [1992/28] |
Former [1990/02] | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HALBEFFEKTSENSORS FÜR AUFNAHMEMAGNETKOPF | [1990/02] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING HALL EFFECT SENSOR FOR MAGNETIC RECORDING HEAD | [1990/02] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN CAPTEUR A EFFET HALL POUR TETE D'ENREGISTREMENT MAGNETIQUE | [1990/02] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.1989 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.1989 | Search fee paid | 29.06.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.1989 | Examination requested [1990/02] | 24.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.07.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/50] | 29.07.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4021767 (NONAKA KOHEI, et al); | [A]EP0244737 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) | International search | [A]US3605258 (FISHER ROBERT D, et al); | [A]US4392167 (JOORMANN HENDRIK J M [NL]); | [A]US4406722 (CHOW WILLIAM W [US], et al); | [A]US4577250 (SATO KAZUHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US4587509 (PITT GILLIES D [GB], et al) |