EP0390865 - ELECTRICAL SOCKET TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.1994 [1994/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | ||
Former [1990/41] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED (a Pennsylvania corporation) P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASS, Jurgen Hermannstrasse 9 D-6106 Erzhausen / DE | 02 /
HOTEA, Gheorghe AM Felsenkeller 17 D-6103 Griesheim / DE | 03 /
SIEGEL, Günter Laerchenweg 35 D-6369 Niederdorffelden / DE | [1990/41] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/41] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 89901242.1 | 05.12.1988 | [1990/41] | WO1988US04309 | Priority number, date | GB19870028575 | 07.12.1987 Original published format: GB 8728575 | [1990/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8905531 | Date: | 15.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0390865 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0390865 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/11, H01R13/18 | [1990/41] | CPC: |
H01R13/11 (EP);
H01R13/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/34] |
Former [1990/41] | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE ANSCHLUSSBUCHSE | [1990/41] | English: | ELECTRICAL SOCKET TERMINAL | [1990/41] | French: | BORNE DE PRISE DE COURANT ELECTRIQUE | [1990/41] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.1990 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 29.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/41] | 01.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.10.1989 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.1989 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.1989 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.1989 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.1989 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.1989 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.1989 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.1989 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.1989 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.10.1989 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0191539 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]DE3540869 (GROTE & HARTMANN [DE]); | [A]DE8608199U |