EP0454664 - ELECTRIC MACHINE WITH VERTICAL SHAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1994 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/45] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANG, Karl Schmitzweg 122 D-1000 Berlin 45 / DE | [1991/45] | Application number, filing date | 89901531.7 | 26.01.1989 | [1991/45] | WO1989DE00047 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9009052 | Date: | 09.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0454664 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0454664 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H02K9/06, F04D29/26, F16D1/08 | [1991/45] | CPC: |
F04D29/263 (EP,US);
F16D1/08 (EP,US);
H02K9/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI, SE [1991/45] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE MIT VERTIKALER WELLE | [1991/45] | English: | ELECTRIC MACHINE WITH VERTICAL SHAFT | [1991/45] | French: | MACHINE ELECTRIQUE A ARBRE VERTICAL | [1991/45] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.1991 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 03.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/45] | 14.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2286750 (MCMAHAN KENTON D); | [A]DE2135653 (LICENTIA GMBH) |