EP0353307 - SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING PC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIYA, Nobuyuki Yokokawachojutaku 13-106 108, Yokokawacho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193 / JP | 02 /
ONISHI, Yasushi Fanuc Mansion Harimomi 8-304 3511-1, Shibokusa Oshinomura, Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [1990/06] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 89901591.1 | 18.01.1989 | [1990/06] | WO1989JP00042 | Priority number, date | JP19880018604 | 29.01.1988 Original published format: JP 1860488 | [1990/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8907289 | Date: | 10.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0353307 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0353307 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.08.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/04 | [1990/06] | CPC: |
G05B19/05 (EP);
G05B19/054 (EP);
G05B2219/1162 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/06] | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUM STEUERN EINER SPEICHERPROGRAMMIERBAREN STEUERUNG | [1990/06] | English: | SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING PC APPARATUS | [1990/06] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE D'UN ORGANE DE COMMANDE PROGRAMMABLE | [1990/06] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.1989 | Translation filed | 19.10.1989 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.1989 | Search fee paid | 19.10.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.1989 | Examination requested [1990/06] | 30.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 13.04.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [1995/08] | FR | 09.09.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]JP63211004 | [E] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 1 (P-808)(3349) 06 January 1989, & JP-A-63 211004 (HITACHI LTD) 01 September 1988,, & JP63211004 A 19880901 | International search | [P]JPS63211004 ; | [A]JPH06139103 ; | [Y]JPH05968005 ; | [A]JPH05427686 ; | [A]JPS62152005 |