EP0380675 - METHOD FOR MAKING SOUR-MILK PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.10.1992 [1992/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORENBURGSKY GOSUDARSTVENNY MEDITSINSKY INSTITUT ul. Sovetskaya 6 Orenburg, 460834 / RU | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | For all designated states ORENBURGSKY GOSUDARSTVENNY MEDITSINSKY INSTITUT ul. Sovetskaya 6 Orenburg, 460834 / SU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIKITENKO, Vyacheslav Ivanovich ul. Volodarskogo, 27-53 Orenburg, 460000 / SU | [1990/32] | Representative(s) | von Füner, Alexander, et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | von Füner, Alexander, Dr., et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89901597.8 | 04.11.1988 | [1990/32] | WO1988SU00222 | Priority number, date | SU19884428223 | 15.04.1988 Original published format: SU 4428223 | [1990/32] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8909546 | Date: | 19.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0380675 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SU | 19.10.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A23C9/12 | [1990/32] | CPC: |
A23C9/1203 (EP,US);
Y10S435/839 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, LI, NL, SE [1990/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SAUERMILCHPRODUKTEN | [1990/32] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING SOUR-MILK PRODUCTS | [1990/32] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LA PREPARATION DE PRODUITS LACTES FERMENTES | [1990/32] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.1989 | Translation filed | 14.12.1989 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.1989 | Search fee paid | 14.12.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/32] | 21.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP7214911 ; | [X]FR2125434 (BEATRICE FOODS CO); | [A]DE643945 (ALEXANDER AXELROD DIPL ING DR) | [X] - FOOOD SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY ABSTRACTS, Nr. 7210-P1570(72053081); & JP-A-72 14 911 (Y. ISHIKURA) 1972, & JP7214911 A 00000000 | International search | [A]DE2165655 ; | [A]US3480443 (SCHULER ROLF); | [A]DE3300122 (KLUPSCH HANS JOACHIM); | [A]SU1316629 (UK NII MYASNOJ MOLOCHNOJ PROMY [SU]); | SU1291110 [ ] (LITOVSKIJ VNII MASLODELNOJ [SU]) |