EP0389569 - CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT WITH ADJUSTABLE ACTIVE AND/OR PASSIVE COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Österreich Siemensstrasse 88 - 92 1210 Wien / AT | For:BE
CH
DE
ES
FR
GB
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | For:AT
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Österreich Siemensstrasse 88 - 92 A-1210 Wien / AT | ||
For:BE
CH
DE
ES
FR
GB
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | |||
Former [1990/40] | For:AT
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Österreich Siemensstrasse 88 - 92 A-1210 Wien / AT | ||
For:BE
CH
DE
FR
GB
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WURMITZER, Armin Kainachgasse 19/5/12 A-1210 Wien / AT | 02 /
FORMANEK, Karl Simmeringer Hauptstr. 16/4/11 A-1110 Wien / AT | [1990/40] | Application number, filing date | 89902032.5 | 01.02.1989 | [1990/40] | WO1989EP00083 | Priority number, date | AT19880000207 | 02.02.1988 Original published format: AT 20788 | [1990/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8907366 | Date: | 10.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0389569 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0389569 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H03G3/00, H04M1/57 | [1990/40] | CPC: |
H03G3/3026 (EP);
H03G3/001 (EP);
H04M1/6025 (EP);
H04R25/603 (EP);
H04R25/609 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/03] |
Former [1990/40] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG MIT STELLBAREN AKTIVEN UND BZW. ODER PASSIVEN BAUTEILEN | [1990/40] | English: | CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT WITH ADJUSTABLE ACTIVE AND/OR PASSIVE COMPONENTS | [1990/40] | French: | CIRCUIT A COMPOSANTS ACTIFS ET/OU PASSIFS REGLABLES | [1990/40] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1991/05: Verbunden mit 89200357.5/0380819 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 19.12.90 | EPB 1991/05: Consolidated with 89200357.5/0380819 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 19.12.90 | EPB 1991/05: Jointe à la demande no. 89200357.5/0380819 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 19.12.90 | EPB 1991/04: Verbunden mit 89200357.5/0380819 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 07.12.90 | EPB 1991/04: Consolidated with 89200357.5/0380819 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 07.12.90 | EPB 1991/04: Jointe à la demande no. 89200357.5/0380819 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 07.12.90 | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.1990 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 28.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/40] | 28.02.1990 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 18.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.1991 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 22.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 23.10.1991 | [2000/04] | Cited in | International search | WO8001632 [ ] (MICHEL A); | GB2146191 [ ] (GEN ELECTRIC CO PLC); | DE3642828 [ ] (TOEPHOLM & WESTERMANN [DK]) | Examination | - Elektronik, Band 32, Nr. 19, 23. September 1983, (München, DE); H. Lemme: "ICs für die Fernsprechtechnik", Seiten 118-130 | - EDN Electrical Design News, Band 28, Nr. 20, 29. September 1983, (Boston, Massachusetts, US); L Sherman: "Monolithic digital gain sets provide precise network control", Seiten 143-148 |