EP0357718 - PAPER MOVEMENT MONITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.1994 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 18.01.1995 [1995/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNISYS CORPORATION Township Lane and Union Meetings Roads Blue Bell Pennsylvania 19424 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/11] | For all designated states UNISYS CORPORATION Township Lane and Union Meetings Roads Blue Bell Pennsylvania 19424 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEELE, David 24 Beresford Gardens Edinburgh 5 Scotland / GB | [1990/11] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/11] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89902331.1 | 27.01.1989 | [1990/11] | WO1989US00334 | Priority number, date | GB19880003793 | 18.02.1988 Original published format: GB 8803793 | [1990/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8907529 | Date: | 24.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0357718 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0357718 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B41J15/04, B41J29/46 | [1990/11] | CPC: |
B41J11/42 (EP);
B41J29/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/11] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR PAPIERVORSCHUBÜBERWACHUNG | [1990/11] | English: | PAPER MOVEMENT MONITOR | [1990/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF SERVANT A CONTROLER LE DEFILEMENT D'UNE BANDE DE PAPIER | [1990/11] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.1989 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/15] | 02.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 01.09.1993 | NL | 01.09.1993 | GB | 27.01.1994 | [1995/03] |
Former [1994/26] | BE | 01.09.1993 | |
NL | 01.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | NL | 01.09.1993 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP59222370 ; | [X]US3917142 ; | [X]DE2746059 ; | [X]US3949856 ; | [A]US3323700 ; | [A]US3148814 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 9, No. 98, (M-375); & JP,A,59 222 370 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 14-12-1984., & JP59222370 A 00000000 |