EP0353291 - DYNAMIC CONTINUOUS FLOW ENZYME REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1993 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOUNT SINAI SCHOOL OF MEDICINE OF THE CITY UNIVERSITY OF NEW YORK One Gustave L. Levy Place New York, NY 10029 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | For all designated states MOUNT SINAI SCHOOL OF MEDICINE OF THE CITY UNIVERSITY OF NEW YORK One Gustave L. Levy Place New York, NY 10029 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEMERSON, Yale Box 550 Great Barrington, MA 01230 / US | 02 /
TURITTO, Vincent 717 Scranton Avenue East Rockaway, NY 11518 / US | [1990/06] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Brian Ronald, et al Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | Lucas, Brian Ronald, et al Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89902462.4 | 01.02.1989 | [1990/06] | WO1989US00397 | Priority number, date | US19880154083 | 08.02.1988 Original published format: US 154083 | [1990/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8907133 | Date: | 10.08.1989 | [1989/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0353291 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0353291 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/40, C12Q1/56 | [1990/06] | CPC: |
C12M21/18 (EP,US);
C12M23/06 (EP,US);
C12Q1/56 (EP,US);
G01N2333/96444 (EP,US);
G01N2333/96447 (EP,US);
G01N2333/96463 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/06] | Title | German: | ENZYMREAKTOR MIT DYNAMISCHEM KONTINUIERLICHEM DURCHFLUSS | [1990/06] | English: | DYNAMIC CONTINUOUS FLOW ENZYME REACTOR | [1990/06] | French: | REACTEUR ENZYMATIQUE A FLUX CONTINU DYNAMIQUE | [1990/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.1989 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.1989 | Examination requested [1990/06] | 16.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.01.1993 | BE | 27.01.1993 | IT | 27.01.1993 | NL | 27.01.1993 | SE | 27.01.1993 | LU | 28.02.1993 | [2000/06] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 27.01.1993 | |
BE | 27.01.1993 | ||
IT | 27.01.1993 | ||
NL | 27.01.1993 | ||
SE | 27.01.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 27.01.1993 | |
BE | 27.01.1993 | ||
NL | 27.01.1993 | ||
SE | 27.01.1993 | ||
Former [1993/38] | BE | 27.01.1993 | |
NL | 27.01.1993 | ||
SE | 27.01.1993 | ||
Former [1993/32] | SE | 27.01.1993 | Cited in | International search | DE3311287 [ ] (BEHRINGWERKE AG [DE]) | [ ] - Blood, vol. 72, No. 4, October 1988, Grune & Stratton, Inc. C.H. GEMMELL et al.: "Flow as a Regulator of the Activation of Factor X by Tissue Factor", pages 1404-1406 | [ ] - Biological Abstracts, Vol. 62, 15 December 1976 (Philadelphia, PA, US) S.M. STRUKOVA: "Molecular Conversion of Prothrombin to Thrombin: I. Mechanism of Activation of Factor X" *see Abstract 64580, & Vestn. Mosk. Univ. Ser. vi Biol. Prochvoved, 30(6): 22-40, 1975* | [ ] - The Journal of Biological Chemistry, Vol. 257, No. 10, May 1982 (US) M. ZUR et al.: "The Dual Role of Factor VII in Blood Coagulation" pages 5623-5631 | [ ] - Blood, Vol. 71, No. 1, January 1988, The Journal of the American Society of Hematology, Grune & Stratton, Inc. Y. NEMERSON: "Tissue Factor and Hemostasis", pages 1-18 | [ ] - Biochemistry, Vol. 25, No. 14, 1986, American Chemical Society, (US) R. BACH et al.: "Factor VII Binding to Tissue Factor in reconstituted Phospholipid Vesicles: Induction of Cooperativity by Phosphatidylserine" pages 4007-4020 |