EP0355155 - INSERTABLE COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.1993 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weh, Erwin Siemensstrasse 5 89257 Illertissen / DE | For all designated states Weh, Wolfgang Siemensstr. 5 89257 Illertissen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states Weh, Erwin Siemensstrasse 5 D-89257 Illertissen / DE | ||
For all designated states WEH, Wolfgang Siemensstr. 5 D-89257 Illertissen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/41] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 D-80750 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/39] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1990/09] | Kahler, Kurt, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener & Sturm P.O. Box 12 49 D-87712 Mindelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 89902643.9 | 20.02.1989 | [1990/09] | WO1989EP00154 | Priority number, date | DE19880002195U | 20.02.1988 Original published format: DE 8802195 U | [1990/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8907729 | Date: | 24.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0355155 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0355155 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/12 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
F16L37/1215 (EP);
F16L37/121 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/09] | Title | German: | STECKKUPPLUNG | [1990/09] | English: | INSERTABLE COUPLING | [1990/09] | French: | RACCORD EMBOITABLE | [1990/09] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.1989 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.1989 | Examination requested [1990/09] | 27.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 16.09.1992 | AT | 20.02.1993 | CH | 28.02.1993 | LI | 28.02.1993 | LU | 28.02.1993 | [2000/06] |
Former [1994/32] | BE | 16.09.1992 | |
AT | 20.02.1993 | ||
CH | 28.02.1993 | ||
LI | 28.02.1993 | ||
Former [1994/04] | BE | 16.09.1992 | |
CH | 28.02.1993 | ||
LI | 28.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/19] | BE | 16.09.1992 | Cited in | International search | US4716938 [ ] (WEH ERWIN [DE], et al); | US3757836 [ ] (MASUDA E); | DE3247784 [ ] (WEH ERWIN) |