EP0360852 - NOVEL PARTICULATE EXPANDABLE STYRENE POLYMERS HAVING SHORT MINIMUM MOLDING TIMES AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.1994 [1994/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCOTT PAPER COMPANY Scott Plaza 2 Philadelphia, PA 19113 / US | [1990/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITE, Thomas, B. 427 Pearl Street Keller, TX 76248 / US | 02 /
UEBELHART, James, J. 236 Northglen Hurst, TX 76054 / US | [1990/14] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89902915.1 | 24.02.1989 | [1990/14] | WO1989US00683 | Priority number, date | US19880160197 | 25.02.1988 Original published format: US 160197 | [1990/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8908126 | Date: | 08.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0360852 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0360852 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.09.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/22 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
C08J9/224 (EP,US);
C08J9/22 (KR);
C08L25/00 (KR);
C08J2325/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, SE [1990/14] | Title | German: | SCHÄUMBARE POLYSTYROLTEILCHEN MIT KURZEN FORMZEITEN UND VERFAHREN IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [1993/44] | English: | NOVEL PARTICULATE EXPANDABLE STYRENE POLYMERS HAVING SHORT MINIMUM MOLDING TIMES AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME | [1990/14] | French: | NOUVEAUX POLYMERES DE STYRENE DILATABLES PARTICULAIRES AYANT DES TEMPS DE MOULAGE MINIMUM COURTS ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [1990/14] |
Former [1990/14] | TEILCHENWEISE AUSDEHNBARE STYRENPOLYMERE MIT KURZEN MINIMUMGIESSZEITEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.1989 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.1989 | Search fee paid | 25.10.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/18] | 29.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents have been disclosed. | International search | [A]US2889782 (SMITH LUCIAN B); | [A]US3480570 (ROBERTS BRINLEY, et al); | [A]US3789028 (HEISKEL E, et al); | [A]US4238570 (OSAWA MICHIHISA [JP], et al); | [A]US4281036 (LEITHAEUSER HORST, et al); | [A]US4361656 (MOSTAFA MOHAMED A); | [A]US4495224 (RIGLER JOSEF-KARL [DE], et al) |