EP0408609 - ABRASIVE CLEANING OR CUTTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1991 | Change - miscellaneous | published on 19.06.1991 [1991/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cleaning Technology Limited Ashley Estate Exmoor Avenue Skippingdale Industrial Park Scunthorpe DN15 8NJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | For all designated states CLEANING TECHNOLOGY LIMITED Ashley Estate Exmoor Avenue Skippingdale Industrial Park Scunthorpe DN15 8NJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRASER, George, Malcolm 4 Forkedale Barton-on-Humber South Humberside DN18 5NE / GB | [1991/04] | Representative(s) | Brown, David Leslie, et al Page Hargrave Southgate Whitefriars Lewins Mead, Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | Brown, David Leslie, et al Page Hargrave Temple Gate House Temple Gate Bristol BS1 6PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 89903514.1 | 28.02.1989 | [1991/04] | WO1989GB00201 | Priority number, date | GB19880004970 | 02.03.1988 Original published format: GB 8804970 | GB19880027582 | 25.11.1988 Original published format: GB 8827582 | GB19880027583 | 25.11.1988 Original published format: GB 8827583 | [1991/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8908007 | Date: | 08.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0408609 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B24C7/00, B05B7/14 | [1991/04] | CPC: |
B05B7/1431 (EP,US);
B24C1/045 (EP,US);
B24C1/086 (EP,US);
B24C7/0046 (EP,US);
B24C7/0084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/04] | Title | German: | SCHLEIFENDES REINIGEN ODER SCHNEIDEN | [1991/04] | English: | ABRASIVE CLEANING OR CUTTING | [1991/04] | French: | NETTOYAGE OU DECOUPAGE PAR ABRASION | [1991/04] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Miscellaneous | EPB 1991/25: Verfahren abgeschlossen infolge Verbindung mit 89301973.7/0335503 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) vom 07.05.91 | EPB 1991/25: Proceedings concluded following consolidation with 89301973.7/0335503 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 07.05.91 | EPB 1991/25: Procédure close par suite de la jonction avec la demande no. 89301973.7/0335503 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 07.05.91 | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.1990 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 16.08.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | BE474882 [ ]; | EP0086616 [ ] (IND CHEMICAL CLEANERS HULL LIM [GB]); | GB2097304 [ ] (FRASER GEORGE MALCOLM); | FR351641 [ ] (MARINE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY [US]); | GB2112680 [ ] (WORLDWIDE BLAST CLEANING LTD); | EP0061756 [ ] (GEESTHACHT GKSS FORSCHUNG [DE], et al); | GB2045658 [ ] (WOMA LTD); | GB2077158 [ ] (WOOD GROUP STRUCTURAL COATINGS); | US4412402 [ ] (GALLANT BEN J [US]); | DE3410981 [ ] (LOEGEL CHARLES JR); | GB1070867 [ ] (PANGBORN CORP); | US2371434 [ ] (EPPLER ARTHUR H); | US4209952 [ ] (ODDS DAVID J H [GB]); | FR2577457 [ ] (THOMANN MICHEL [FR]); | US3347469 [ ] (ROSS RONALD A, et al); | DE3617692 [ ] (FERTL KLAUS [DE]) |