EP0404808 - AUTOMATIC CONTROL SYSTEM FOR THE TRANSFER OF THE DRIVE POWER BETWEEN A TRACTOR AND A TRAILER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORION-YHTYMÄ OY NORMET 74510 Peltosalmi / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1991/01] | For all designated states ORION-YHTYMÄ OY NORMET SF-74510 Peltosalmi / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEINO, Reijo Orioninkatu 7 C 20 SF-53850 Lappeenranta / FI | [1991/01] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al MARKS & CLERK 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/01] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al MARKS & CLERK 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 89903749.3 | 10.03.1989 | [1991/01] | WO1989FI00044 | Priority number, date | FI19880001439 | 25.03.1988 Original published format: FI 881439 | [1991/01] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8909352 | Date: | 05.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0404808 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0404808 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/46, B60K17/356 | [1994/48] | CPC: |
B62D59/02 (EP,US);
F16H61/46 (EP,US);
F16H61/475 (EP,US);
F16H61/423 (EP,US);
F16H61/433 (EP,US);
F16H61/448 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/01] | F16H39/50, B60K17/356 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/01] | Title | German: | SELBSTTÄTIGES REGELUNGSSYSTEM ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG DER ANTRIEBSKRAFT ZWISCHEN EINEM TRAKTOR UND SEINEM ANHÄNGER | [1991/01] | English: | AUTOMATIC CONTROL SYSTEM FOR THE TRANSFER OF THE DRIVE POWER BETWEEN A TRACTOR AND A TRAILER | [1991/01] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE AUTOMATIQUE POUR LE TRANSFERT DE LA PUISSANCE D'ENTRAINEMENT ENTRE UN TRACTEUR ET UNE REMORQUE | [1991/01] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.1989 | Translation filed | 30.10.1989 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.1989 | Examination requested [1991/01] | 24.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1992 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   03.09.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.11.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 30.11.1994 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4542990 (FOUQUET JEAN-CLAUDE [FR]); | [A]US4369855 (BUSCHBOM FLOYD E, et al); | [A]DE3628175 (HYDROMATIK GMBH); | [A]WO8807150 (PARIKKALAN KONE JA LAITEHUOLTO [FI]) | Examination | FI8603464 | - FI-A 86-03464, & FI8603464 A 00000000 |