EP0407423 - SYSTEM FOR TRANSFERRING BINARY INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUNDGREN & NORDSTRAND AB Monbijougatan 17B S-211 53 Malmö / SE | [1991/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUNDGREN, Sten Järnakravägen 19 C S-222 25 Lund / SE | [1991/03] | Representative(s) | Berglund, Gustav Arthur, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/03] | Berglund, Gustav Arthur, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 S-200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 89903830.1 | 13.03.1989 | [1991/03] | WO1989SE00123 | Priority number, date | SE19880000896 | 14.03.1988 Original published format: SE 8800896 | [1991/03] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8908958 | Date: | 21.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0407423 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0407423 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 21.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28 | [1991/03] | CPC: |
G08C15/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1991/03] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON BINÄRINFORMATION | [1991/03] | English: | SYSTEM FOR TRANSFERRING BINARY INFORMATION | [1991/03] | French: | SYSTEME SERVANT AU TRANSFERT D'INFORMATIONS BINAIRES | [1991/03] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.1989 | Translation filed | 07.09.1990 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 07.09.1990 | Examination requested [1991/03] | 07.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 01.06.1994 | IT | 01.06.1994 | NL | 01.06.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 01.06.1994 | |
IT | 01.06.1994 | ||
NL | 01.06.1994 | ||
Former [1995/13] | BE | 01.06.1994 | |
NL | 01.06.1994 | ||
Former [1995/12] | BE | 01.06.1994 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2259223 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]US4199661 (BLUMKE EUGENE G [US], et al); | [A]EP0023105 (WARD GOLDSTONE LTD [GB]); | [A]US4301532 (JANETZKY DITTMAR); | [A]EP0216372 |