EP0424389 - CONTROL MEANS FOR HOISTING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.1995 [1995/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PARATOR AB Box 143 S-195 01 Märsta / SE | [1991/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STENLUND, Stig Bataljvägen 22 S-133 00 Saltsjöbaden / SE | 02 /
BAECKLUND, Jan Alsike 504 S-741 00 Knivsta / SE | [1991/18] | Representative(s) | Bäckström, Leif C. Protector Leif C. Bäckström AB Sandviksvägen 32 165 65 Hässelby / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/18] | Bäckström, Leif C. Protector Leif C. Bäckström AB P.O. Box 5132 S-165 12 Hässelby / SE | Application number, filing date | 89903853.3 | 15.03.1989 | [1991/18] | WO1989SE00133 | Priority number, date | SE19880000925 | 15.03.1988 Original published format: SE 8800925 | [1991/18] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8908785 | Date: | 21.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0424389 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 21.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F15B11/02, // F15B15/20 | [1991/18] | CPC: |
F15B15/204 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/18] | Title | German: | REGELVORRICHTUNG FÜR HEBEANORDNUNGEN | [1991/18] | English: | CONTROL MEANS FOR HOISTING DEVICES | [1991/18] | French: | ORGANE DE COMMANDE POUR DISPOSITIFS DE LEVAGE | [1991/18] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.1989 | Translation filed | 10.09.1990 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FR | 10.09.1990 | Examination requested [1991/18] | 16.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/12] | 26.10.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1995/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0060945 ; | [X]EP0057996 ; | [D]SE396985 |