EP0410990 - MULTISTEP METHOD FOR SEPARATING ORGANIC COMPOUNDS FROM A SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GOTLIEB, Itzhak 5 Balsam Court Roseland, NJ 07068 / US | For all designated states ZIDON, Aharon 27 Hamaalot Street Givataim 53100 / IL | [1991/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/06] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1991/06] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward MEWBURN ELLIS 2 Cursitor Street London EC4A 1BQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89904438.2 | 29.03.1989 | [1991/06] | WO1989US01435 | Priority number, date | US19880181665 | 14.04.1988 Original published format: US 181665 | [1991/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8909641 | Date: | 19.10.1989 | [1989/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0410990 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0410990 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01D11/00, C02F1/26, C07B63/00 | [1991/06] | CPC: |
B01D61/16 (EP,US);
B01D61/145 (EP,US);
C02F1/26 (EP,US);
B01D2311/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/06] | Title | German: | MEHRSTUFEN-VERFAHREN ZUR ABTRENNUNG VON ORGANISCHEN VERBINDUNGEN AUS EINER LÖSUNG | [1991/06] | English: | MULTISTEP METHOD FOR SEPARATING ORGANIC COMPOUNDS FROM A SOLUTION | [1991/06] | French: | PROCEDE A ETAPES MULTIPLES POUR LA SEPARATION DE COMPOSES ORGANIQUES D'UNE SOLUTION | [1991/06] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.1990 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FR | 09.10.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 30.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 13.10.1993 | CH | 13.10.1993 | IT | 13.10.1993 | LI | 13.10.1993 | NL | 13.10.1993 | [1999/42] |
Former [1994/39] | BE | 13.10.1993 | |
CH | 13.10.1993 | ||
LI | 13.10.1993 | ||
NL | 13.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/38] | BE | 13.10.1993 | |
CH | 13.10.1993 | ||
LI | 13.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/18] | CH | 13.10.1993 | |
LI | 13.10.1993 | Cited in | International search | [X] - Journal of Membrane Science, vol. 30, no. 1, 1-3,33 January 1987, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V. (Amsterdam, NL), L. Lane Gibbs et al.: "Removal of n-alcohols from aqueous streams using micellar-enhanced ultra-filtration", pages 67-74, see page 64, "Summary" page 68; page 69, lines 23-24, "The alcohol/surfactant ratic in ..." | [X] - Chemical Abstracts, vol. 94, no. 10, 9 March 1981 (Columbus, Ohio, US), P.S. Leung et al.: "Surfactant micelle enhanced ultrafiltration", see page 428, abstract no. 72139r, & Polym. Sci. Technol. 1980, 13 (Ultrafiltr. Membr. Appl.), 415-21 | [A] - Kirk-Othmer: "encyclopedia of Chemical Technology", vol. 22, 3rd edition, 1983, John Wiley & Sons (New York, US), "Surfactants and detersive systems", pages 332-346, see page 332; page 341, "Effects of surfactants on the properties of solutions" - page 342; page 344, "Micelles" - page 346 | [A] - Separation Science and Technology, vol. 20, no. 4, 1985, Marcel Dekker, Inc. (New York, US), R.O. Dunn Jr. et al.: "Use of micellarenhanced ultrafiltration to remove dissolved organics from aqueous streams", pages 257-284, see the abstract | Examination | - Journal of Membrane Science, vol. 30, no. 1, January 1987, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V. (Amsterdam, NL), L. Lane Gibbs et al.: "Removal of n-alcohols from aqueous streams using micellar-enhanced ultra-filtration", pages 67-74, see page 64, "Summary" - page 68; page 69, lines 23-24, "The alcohol/surfactant ratio in ..." |