EP0398996 - A COMPLIANCE METER FOR CLINICAL EVALUATION OF DRUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.02.1994 [1994/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPUMED AB Glunten S-751 83 Uppsala / SE | [1990/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ECKERNÄS, Sven-Ake Eriksbergsvägen 7A S-752 39 Uppsala / SE | 02 /
DAHLSTRÖM, Bengt Rapphönsvägen 4B S-752 52 Uppsala / SE | [1990/48] | Representative(s) | Grennberg, Erik Bertil, et al Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/48] | Grennberg, Erik Bertil, et al H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, Box 3137 S-103 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 89904652.8 | 29.03.1989 | [1990/48] | WO1989SE00162 | Priority number, date | SE19880001163 | 29.03.1988 Original published format: SE 8801163 | [1990/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8909042 | Date: | 05.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0398996 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0398996 | Date: | 10.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61J7/00 | [1990/48] | CPC: |
A61J7/0481 (EP,US);
A61J1/035 (EP,US);
A61J2200/30 (EP,US);
A61J2200/70 (EP,US);
A61J2205/00 (EP,US);
A61J7/0418 (EP,US);
A61J7/0436 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/48] | Title | German: | TABLETTENAUSGABE-ANZEIGEINSTRUMENT FÜR DIE KLINISCHE AUSWERTUNG VON MEDIKAMENTEN | [1990/48] | English: | A COMPLIANCE METER FOR CLINICAL EVALUATION OF DRUGS | [1990/48] | French: | INDICATEUR DE SUIVI DE L'ORDONNANCE POUR EVALUATION CLINIQUE DE MEDICAMENTS | [1990/48] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.1990 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 07.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/48] | 10.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0191168 (SIMON UDO); | [A]GB2198425 (PYXIS CORP) |