EP0411009 - A VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.1995 [1995/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states D'ARCHAMBAUD, Charles Percival 269 Stockford Road Guide Bridge Ashton-under-Lyne OL7 0NT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/06] | For all designated states D'ARCHAMBAUD, Charles Percival 269 Stockford Road Guide Bridge Ashton-under-Lyne OL7 0NT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/06] | Representative(s) | Massey, Alexander, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [1991/06] | Application number, filing date | 89904853.2 | 12.04.1989 | [1991/06] | WO1989GB00390 | Priority number, date | GB19880008986 | 15.04.1988 Original published format: GB 8808986 | [1991/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8909903 | Date: | 19.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0411009 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/363, F17C13/04, A62B9/02, B60T17/18 | [1991/06] | CPC: |
F17C13/045 (EP,US);
A62B9/02 (EP,US);
B60T17/18 (EP,US);
F16K31/363 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0146 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0335 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0385 (EP,US);
F17C2221/031 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0123 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0153 (EP,US);
F17C2250/043 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0636 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/06] | Title | German: | VENTIL | [1991/06] | English: | A VALVE | [1991/06] | French: | SOUPAPE | [1991/06] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.1990 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 09.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 22.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/12] | 26.10.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1995/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.11.1990 | M01   Fee paid on   09.11.1990 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1993 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   19.10.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE3529487 [ ] (AUERGESELLSCHAFT GMBH); | DE1182968 [ ] (GRAUBREMSE GMBH); | US4281677 [ ] (HOFFMAN DAVID A); | US3008481 [ ] (MATHESON THOMAS F); | US3633606 [ ] (HAY WAYNE W, et al); | GB792201 [ ] (BRITISH OXYGEN CO LTD); | GB658516 [ ] (HUBERT ELWELL SMITH) |