EP0407582 - DERIVATIVES OF TRICHLOROPHOSPHASOCARBACYLS AND INSECTICIDAL, VIRICIDAL, HEMATOCIDAL, FUNGICIDAL AND OVOCIDAL PREPARATIONS BASED ON THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.1991 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.1991 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.01.1992 [1992/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIEVSKY NAUCHNO-ISSLEDOVATELSKY INSTITUT EPIDEMIOLOGII I INFEKTSIONNYKH BOLEZNEI IMENI L.V. GROMASCHEVSKOGO supusk Stepana Razina, 4 Kiev, 252038 / SU | [N/P] |
Former [1991/03] | For all designated states KIEVSKY NAUCHNO-ISSLEDOVATELSKY INSTITUT EPIDEMIOLOGII I INFEKTSIONNYKH BOLEZNEI IMENI L.V.GROMASCHEVSKOGO supusk Stepana Razina, 4 Kiev, 252038 / SU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUDAVSKY, Vladimir Panteleimonovich ul. Bazhova, 10-42 Kiev, 252100 / SU | 02 /
KUCHEROVA, Margarita Nikolaevna ul. Vetryanye gory, 10d-17 Kiev, 252123 / SU | 03 /
KUZNETSOVA, Natalia Anatolievna ul. Ivana Nekhody, 5-39 Kiev, 252141 / SU | 04 /
SADOVSKAYA, Nina Pavlovna ul. Planerskaya, 2/26-1 Kiev, 252061 / SU | 05 /
ZAGNIBIDA, Dmitry Makarovich ul. Tropinina, 2/4-62 Kiev, 252107 / SU | 06 /
VIKTOROV-NABOKOV, Oleg Viktorovich bulvar Koltsova, 3-51 Kiev, 252194 / SU | 07 /
SHABLOSVKAYA, Evgenia Alexandrovna ul. Pochaininskaya, 35-22 Kiev, 252070 / SU | 08 /
STEPANCHUK, Valentin Andreevich ul. Priozernaya, 12a-110 Kiev, 252211 / SU | 09 /
MATOSHKO, Galina Viktorovna ul. Alexeevskaya, 2-37 Kiev, 252110 / SU | 10 /
GORELOV, Stanislav Anatolievich ul. Tupoleva, 6-62 Kiev, 252049 / SU | 11 /
SMOLINA, Anna Iosifovna ul. Kurnatovskogo, 22-120 Kiev, 252139 / SU | 12 /
NOVIKOV, Ivan Nikolaevich Darnitsky bulvar, 3a-28 Kiev, 252192 / SU | 13 /
SHOMOVA, Evgenia Alexandrovna ul. Darvina, 6-8 Kiev, 252004 / SU | 14 /
KUPRINA, Zhanna Stanislavovna ul. Entuziastov, 29/2-112 Kiev, 252147 / SU | 15 /
BULGAKOV, Vsevolod Afanasievich ul. Oktyabrskoi revoljutsii, 16-30 Kiev, 252021 / SU | 16 /
PONOMAREVA, Viktoria Efimovna ul. Karla Marxa, 12-43 Kiev, 252001 / SU | 17 /
DANKO, Oleg Pavlovich ul. Geroev Kosmosa, 1a-80 Kiev, 252148 / SU | [1991/03] | Representative(s) | Spencer, Graham Easdale, et al A.A. Thornton & CO Northumberland House 303-306, High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [1991/03] | Application number, filing date | 89904877.1 | 13.01.1989 | [1991/03] | WO1989SU00005 | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9008150 | Date: | 26.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0407582 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SU | 26.07.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/09, C07F9/24, A01N57/28, A01N57/30, A61K31/675 | [1991/03] | CPC: |
A01N57/28 (EP);
A01N57/30 (EP);
C07F9/065 (EP);
C07F9/5355 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/03] | Title | German: | TRICHLOROPHOSPHASOCARBACYL-DERIVATE UND SIE ENTHALTENDE VIRIZIDE, NEMATOZIDE, FUNGIZIDE UND OVOZIDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1991/03] | English: | DERIVATIVES OF TRICHLOROPHOSPHASOCARBACYLS AND INSECTICIDAL, VIRICIDAL, HEMATOCIDAL, FUNGICIDAL AND OVOCIDAL PREPARATIONS BASED ON THEM | [1991/03] | French: | DERIVES DE TRICHLOROPHOSPHASOCARBACYLES ENTRANT DANS LA COMPOSITION DE PREPARATIONS INSECTICIDES, VIRUCIDES, HEMATOCIDES, FONGICIDES ET OVOCIDES | [1991/03] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.1990 | Translation filed | 19.09.1990 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.1990 | Search fee paid | 19.09.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.1990 | Examination requested [1991/03] | 28.11.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - CANADIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, vol. 61, 1983, pages 118-123, National Research Council of Canada, CA; V. MIZRAHI et al.: "Alkylation of ambident ions derived from phosphoric-carboxylic imides. N-BENZOYl-O,O-dimethyl-O-ethylphosphorimidate and E/Z O-ETHYL-N-(dimethylphosphoryl)benzimidate" | International search | [A]SU666810 ; | [A]SU276621 | [Y] - Zhurnal Obschei Khimii Vol. XLII (CIV), vyp. 4, 1972 (Nauka, Leningrad), V.P. RUDAVSKY. "Fosforilirovannye Proizvodnye Trikhloruksusnoi Kisloty", see pages 797-801 | [Y] - Khimicheskaya Teknologia No 1 (55), 1971, (Naukova Dumka, Kiev), V.P. RUDAVSKY et al. "Nekotorye Proizvodnye Trikhlor -U Bis - Trikhlorfosfazogaloidkarbatsilov", see pages 19-23 | [Y] - Fiziologicheski Aktivnye Veschestva, Sbornik, Vypusk 4, 1, 11 1972, Naukova Dumka (Kiev), E.A. SHOMOVA et al. "Fungitsidnaya Aktivnost Triamidofosfazogaloidkarbatsilov", see pages 15-17 | [A] - Referativny Zhurnal "Khimia", 19I, No.18, 1981, see page 55, column 2, Abstract No. 180297, V.P. RUDAVSKY "Biskhlorfosfazoiminoatsily", "Khim. Tekno", (Kiev), 1980, No.6, pages 63-64 |