EP0406325 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR FILLING INSULATING GLASS PANES WITH A HEAVY GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 30.05.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lenhardt Maschinenbau GmbH Industriestrasse 2-4 D-75242 Neuhausen / DE | [1991/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LENHARDT, Karl Industriestrasse 2-4 D-7531 Neuhausen-Hamberg / DE | 02 /
BOGNER, Uwe Drei-Eichen-Weg 27 D-7530 Pforzheim-Huchenfeld / DE | [1991/02] | Representative(s) | Twelmeier, Ulrich, et al Zerrennerstrasse 23-25 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | Twelmeier, Ulrich, Dipl.Phys., et al Westliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 29-31 D-75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 89905079.3 | 04.05.1989 | [1991/02] | WO1989EP00493 | Priority number, date | DE19883815139 | 04.05.1988 Original published format: DE 3815139 | DE19883832836 | 28.09.1988 Original published format: DE 3832836 | [1991/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8911021 | Date: | 16.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0406325 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0406325 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/41] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0406325 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/66 | [1991/02] | CPC: |
E06B3/6775 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM FÜLLEN VON ISOLIERGLASSCHEIBEN MIT EINEM SCHWERGAS | [1991/02] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR FILLING INSULATING GLASS PANES WITH A HEAVY GAS | [1991/02] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR REMPLIR DES VITRES ISOLANTES DE GAZ LOURD | [1991/02] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.1990 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 31.10.1990 | Examination requested [1991/02] | 12.11.1990 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 04.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.04.1991 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 15.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.05.1992
15.05.1992
ADMISSIBLE Glastechnische Industrie Peter Lisec GmbH Bahnhofstr 34 A-3363 Amstetten-Hausmening / AT Opponent's representative Beer, Manfred, et al, et al BEER & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.05.1992
15.05.1992
ADMISSIBLE Glastechnische Industrie Peter Lisec GmbH Bahnhofstr 34 A-3363 Amstetten-Hausmening / AT Opponent's representative Beer, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Lindengasse 8 A-1070 Wien / AT | 17.08.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.02.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.05.1996 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.05.1996 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 12.05.1997 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 01.06.1994 | Appeal received No. T0458/94 | 03.08.1994 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.05.1996 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 23.05.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.06.1996 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE3402323 [ ] (INTERPANE ENTW & BERATUNGSGES [DE]); | GB2099057 [ ] (LISEC PETER); | EP0056762 [ ] (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]); | FR2141848 [ ] (GLAVERBEL) |