EP0417125 - METHOD FOR THE SURVEY OF BUILDING MEASUREMENTS BY TELEMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT INTERNATIONAL DE ROBOTIQUE ET D'INTELLIGENCE ARTIFICIELLE DE MARSEILLE 2, rue Henri-Barbusse F-13001 Marseille / FR | For all designated states DIALOGIC S.A. 70, bld. de Magenta F-75010 Paris / FR | [1992/35] |
Former [1991/12] | For all designated states INSTITUT INTERNATIONAL DE ROBOTIQUE ET D'INTELLIGENCE ARTIFICIELLE DE MARSEILLE 2, rue Henri-Barbusse F-13001 Marseille / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIRAUD, Christian 3, allée du Général-Monsabert F-13380 Plan-de-Cuques / FR | [1991/12] | Representative(s) | Moretti, René, et al c/o Cabinet BEAU DE LOMENIE "Prado-Mermoz" 232, Avenue du Prado 13008 Marseille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/12] | Moretti, René, et al c/o Cabinet BEAU DE LOMENIE "Prado-Mermoz" 232, Avenue du Prado F-13008 Marseille / FR | Application number, filing date | 89905417.5 | 24.04.1989 | [1991/12] | WO1989FR00193 | Priority number, date | FR19880005564 | 22.04.1988 Original published format: FR 8805564 | [1991/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8910538 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0417125 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0417125 | Date: | 10.02.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01C15/00, G01S17/87 | [1991/12] | CPC: |
G01C15/002 (EP);
G01S17/875 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERMESSUNG VON GEBÄUDEN DURCH ABSTANDSMESSUNG | [1991/12] | English: | METHOD FOR THE SURVEY OF BUILDING MEASUREMENTS BY TELEMETRY | [1991/12] | French: | PROCEDE DE LEVE DE METRES DE BATIMENT PAR TELEMETRIE | [1991/12] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.1990 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 19.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/12] | 12.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/05] | Request for further processing for: | 27.11.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 27.11.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.12.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.02.1993 | NL | 10.02.1993 | SE | 10.02.1993 | LU | 30.04.1993 | [2000/06] |
Former [1997/17] | AT | 10.02.1993 | |
NL | 10.02.1993 | ||
SE | 10.02.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 10.02.1993 | |
NL | 10.02.1993 | ||
SE | 10.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/38] | NL | 10.02.1993 | |
SE | 10.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/36] | SE | 10.02.1993 | Cited in | International search | FR2186658 [ ] (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | EP0064013 [ ] (INFOMAIN [FR]) |