EP0365664 - USE OF SYNTHETIC L-CARNITINE IN FOOD FOR DOMESTIC DOGS OR CATS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/18] | METHOD FOR PREVENTING DIET-INDUCED CARNITINE DEFICIENCY IN DOMESTICATED DOGS AND CATS | ||
[1995/14] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 26.11.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.1999 | Opposition rejected | published on 12.01.2000 [2000/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHUG, Austin L. 5322 Lighthouse Bay Drive Madison, WI 53704 / US | For all designated states KEENE, Bruce W. 3429 Redbud Lane Raleigh, NC 27607 / US | [1990/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/18] | Representative(s) | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London ECV 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1990/18] | SERJEANTS 25, The Crescent King Street Leicester, LE1 6RX / GB | Application number, filing date | 89905904.2 | 28.04.1989 | [1990/18] | WO1989US01808 | Priority number, date | US19880187870 | 29.04.1988 Original published format: US 187870 | [1990/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8910065 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0365664 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0365664 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.11.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A23K1/00 | [1990/18] | CPC: |
A61K31/205 (EP,US);
A23K20/174 (EP,US);
A23K50/40 (EP,US);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
Y10S426/805 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/36] |
Former [1990/18] | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON SYNTHETISCHEM L-CARNITIN IN HAUSHUND- ODER -KATZENFUTTER | [1995/14] | English: | USE OF SYNTHETIC L-CARNITINE IN FOOD FOR DOMESTIC DOGS OR CATS | [1995/14] | French: | UTILISATION DE L-CARNITINE DANS LA NOURRITURE DES CHIENS OU CHATS DOMESTIQUES | [1995/14] |
Former [1990/18] | VERFAHREN ZUR VERMEIDUNG DES DURCH DIÄT VERURSACHTEN KARNITINMANGELS BEI HAUSHUNDEN UND -KATZEN | ||
Former [1990/18] | METHOD FOR PREVENTING DIET-INDUCED CARNITINE DEFICIENCY IN DOMESTICATED DOGS AND CATS | ||
Former [1990/18] | PROCEDE PREVENANT LES CARENCES EN CARNITINE DUES A L'ALIMENTATION CHEZ LES CHIENS ET CHATS DOMESTIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.1990 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.1990 | Search fee paid | 22.01.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/18] | 05.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.1996
18.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE American Home Products Corporation Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940 0874 / US Opponent's representative Walters, Philip Bernard William Wyeth Laboratories Patents & Trade Marks Department Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | 02
05.01.1996
22.10.1996
ADMISSIBLE Effem GmbH Eitzer Landstrasse D-27283 Verden / DE Opponent's representative Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.1996
18.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE American Home Products Corporation Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940 0874 / US Opponent's representative Walters, Philip Bernard William Wyeth Laboratories, Patents & Trade Marks Department, Huntercombe Lane South, Taplow Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | ||
02
05.01.1996
22.10.1996
ADMISSIBLE Effem GmbH Eitzer Landstrasse D-27283 Verden / DE Opponent's representative Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | |||
Former [1996/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.01.1996
18.01.1996
ADMISSIBLE Duphar International Research B.V. C.J. van Houtenlaan 36 1381 CP Weesp / NL Opponent's representative Breepoel, Peter M. Octrooibureau Zoan B.V. P.O. Box 140 1380 AC Weesp / NL | ||
02
05.01.1996
22.10.1996
ADMISSIBLE Effem GmbH Eitzer Landstrasse D-27283 Verden / DE Opponent's representative Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | 14.02.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.10.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.10.1996 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.1997 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 20.04.1999 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2000/02] | 20.04.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.05.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.08.1999 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]FR2627063 (SIGMA TAU IND FARMACEUTI [IT]); | [E]WO8906958 (TOPICARN INC [US]) | International search | [X]JPS55121441 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]US4656191 (FANELLI OTTORINO [IT]); | [A]US4434160 (JERETIN STOJAN [YU], et al); | [A]US4254147 (CAVAZZA CLAUDIO); | [A]US4689226 (NURMI ESKO V [FI], et al); | [A]US4702914 (RYAN HILLARY A [US]) |