EP0419505 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING A STABLE, LOW-VISCOSITY OIL-IN-WATER EMULSION OF POLAR OIL COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.1991 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.1991 | Change - miscellaneous | published on 14.08.1991 [1991/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAMBIL, Fred Niederstrasse 96 D-4019 Monheim / DE | 02 /
STRIEPLING, Gert-Lothar Am Dammsteg 62 D-4000 Düsseldorf 13 / DE | 03 /
TESMANN, Holger Vennstrasse 61 D-4000 Düsseldorf 12 / DE | [1991/14] | Application number, filing date | 89906080.0 | 29.05.1989 | [1991/14] | WO1989EP00595 | Priority number, date | DE19883819193 | 06.06.1988 Original published format: DE 3819193 | [1991/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8911907 | Date: | 14.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0419505 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01F17/00 | [1991/14] | CPC: |
A61K8/062 (EP);
A61K8/068 (EP);
A61K8/37 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
C09K23/018 (EP);
C10M173/02 (EP);
A61Q5/00 (EP);
C10M2201/02 (EP);
C10M2203/02 (EP);
C10M2203/022 (EP);
C10M2203/024 (EP);
C10M2203/04 (EP);
C10M2207/021 (EP);
C10M2207/281 (EP);
C10M2207/282 (EP);
C10M2207/283 (EP);
C10M2207/284 (EP);
C10M2207/285 (EP);
C10M2207/286 (EP);
C10M2207/287 (EP);
C10M2207/288 (EP);
C10M2207/289 (EP);
C10M2207/34 (EP);
C10M2207/40 (EP);
C10M2207/402 (EP);
C10M2207/404 (EP);
C10M2209/104 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG STABILER, NIEDRIGVISKOSER ÖL-IN-WASSER-EMULSION POLARER ÖLKOMPONENTEN | [1991/14] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING A STABLE, LOW-VISCOSITY OIL-IN-WATER EMULSION OF POLAR OIL COMPONENTS | [1991/14] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'EMULSIONS AQUEUSES D'HUILE STABLES ET A FAIBLE VISCOSITE A PARTIR DE COMPOSANTS HUILEUX POLAIRES | [1991/14] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1991/33: Verfahren abgeschlossen infolge Verbindung mit 89109632.3/0345586 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) vom 27.06.91 | EPB 1991/33: Proceedings concluded following consolidation with 89109632.3/0345586 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 27.06.91 | EPB 1991/33: Procédure close par suite de la jonction avec la demande no. 89109632.3/0345586 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 27.06.91 | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.1990 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 27.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - ENCYCLOPEDIA OF EMULSION TECHNOLOGY, Vol. 1, 1989, Ed., P. BECHEV, E. DECHEY (New York, US), K. SHINODA et al., "Phase Properties of Emulsions: PIT and HLB"pages 337-367. | [A] - THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS SOCIETY, Vol. 33, Nr. 8, August 1956, (US), R.R. BENERITO et al., "Fat Emulsion, Effect of Heat on Solubility of Hydrophilic Emulsifiers"pages 364-367. | [A] - TENSIDE, Vol. 21, Nr. 1, January/February 1984, (Muenchen, DE), "Standardisierte Stabilitaets-Charakterisierung von Emulsionen"pages 28-33. |