EP0414782 - GEAR BOX WITH CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE GEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.01.1993 [1993/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MODERN AUTOMOTIVE TECHNOLOGIES (M.A.T.) HOLDINGS B.V. Weena 373 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [1992/01] |
Former [1991/10] | For all designated states ANTONOV, Roumen 25, rue d'Artois F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Antonov, Roumen 18 rue de Berri F-75008 Paris / FR | [1992/01] |
Former [1991/10] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Bouju, André Cabinet Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A. B.P. 6250 75818 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/10] | Bouju, André Cabinet Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A. B.P. 6250 F-75818 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 89906138.6 | 12.05.1989 | [1991/10] | WO1989FR00231 | Priority number, date | FR19880006515 | 16.05.1988 Original published format: FR 8806515 | FR19880016988 | 21.12.1988 Original published format: FR 8816988 | [1991/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8911405 | Date: | 30.11.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0414782 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0414782 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60K25/06, F16H3/72 | [1992/05] | CPC: |
F16H3/721 (EP,US);
B60K17/28 (EP,US);
B60K6/26 (EP,US);
B60K6/365 (EP,US);
B60K6/40 (EP,US);
B60K6/48 (EP,US);
F16H3/727 (EP,US);
B60K2006/262 (EP,US);
F16H2037/0866 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1991/10] | B60K25/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/10] | Title | German: | STUFENLOS VERSTELLBARES ZAHNRADGETRIEBE | [1991/10] | English: | GEAR BOX WITH CONTINUOUSLY VARIABLE GEAR | [1991/10] | French: | BOITE DE VITESSES A VARIATION CONTINUE PAR ENGRENAGES | [1991/10] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.1990 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 15.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 12.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE2742305 [ ] (FIAT ALLIS CONSTRUCT MACHINE); | DE7711621U [ ]; | DE3011833 [ ] (TUTTASS EDMOND [DE]) |