EP0406328 - A SOUND ABSORBENT AND HEAT INSULATING FIBER SLAB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.03.1994 [1994/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FREDRIKSSON, Sven Treklövervägen 13 S-459 00 Ljungskile / SE | [1991/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/02] | Representative(s) | Nilsson, Karl Ingvar, et al STENHAGEN PATENTBYRA AB P.O. Box 4630 116 91 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/02] | Nilsson, Karl Ingvar, et al STENHAGEN PATENTBYRA AB P.O. Box 4630 S-116 91 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 89906202.0 | 18.05.1989 | [1991/02] | WO1989SE00277 | Priority number, date | SE19880001876 | 19.05.1988 Original published format: SE 8801876 | [1991/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8911384 | Date: | 30.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0406328 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0406328 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 30.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B27N3/04, B27N9/00, D04H1/66, // B27N1/02, B27N3/12 | [1991/02] | CPC: |
C04B28/26 (EP,US);
B27N9/00 (EP,US);
C08L97/02 (EP,US);
E04B1/90 (EP,US);
C04B2111/52 (EP,US);
E04B2001/8457 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/26, C04B18/24, C04B38/0038 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/02] | Title | German: | SCHALLABSORBIERENDE UND WÄRMEDÄMMENDE FASERPLATTE | [1991/02] | English: | A SOUND ABSORBENT AND HEAT INSULATING FIBER SLAB | [1991/02] | French: | DALLE EN FIBRES D'ISOLATION ACOUSTIQUE ET THERMIQUE | [1991/02] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.1990 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 30.10.1990 | Examination requested [1991/02] | 08.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 17.03.1993 | LI | 17.03.1993 | SE | 17.03.1993 | [1993/46] |
Former [1993/45] | CH | 17.03.1993 | |
LI | 17.03.1993 | Cited in | International search | [A]NO49044C |