EP0371116 - A METHOD OF BALANCING A CONTAINER WHICH ROTATES ABOUT AN ESSENTIALLY HORIZONTAL AXIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1994 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.06.1994 [1994/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AKTIEBOLAGET ELECTROLUX Luxbacken 1 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/23] | For all designated states AKTIEBOLAGET ELECTROLUX Luxbacken 1 S-105 45 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASTWALL, Lennart, Wilhelm kerbyvägen 82 S-183 35 Täby / SE | 02 /
POIKONEN, Jorma, Kalevi Kristofferinkatu 6 SF-21100 Naantali / FI | 03 /
ALKUVAARA, Pekka, Olavi Trädgardsgatan 11-13 D 159 SF-201 00 ABO / FI | [1990/34] |
Former [1990/23] | 01 /
CASTWALL, Lennart, Wilhelm kerbyvägen 82 S-183 35 Täby / SE | ||
02 /
POIKONEN, Jorma, Kalevi Kristofferinkatu 6 SF-21100 Naantali / FI | |||
03 /
ALKUVAARA, Pekka, Olavi Hämenkatau 16 B 19 SF-20500 Turku / FI | Representative(s) | Erixon, Bo, et al C/o AB ELECTROLUX Corporate Patents & Trademarks 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | Erixon, Bo, et al c/o AB ELECTROLUX Corporate Patents & Trademarks S-105 45 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1990/23] | Hagelbäck, Evert Isidor c/o AB Electrolux Patentavdelningen S-105 45 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 89906203.8 | 23.05.1989 | [1990/23] | WO1989SE00288 | Priority number, date | SE19880002011 | 30.05.1988 Original published format: SE 8802011 | [1990/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8912132 | Date: | 14.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0371116 | Date: | 06.06.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0371116 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 14.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/22 | [1990/23] | CPC: |
D06F37/225 (EP,US);
D06F33/48 (EP,US);
D06F34/16 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2109 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM AUSBALANCIEREN EINES BEHÄLTERS, DER UM EINE IM WESENTLICHEN HORIZONTALE ACHSE ROTIERT | [1990/23] | English: | A METHOD OF BALANCING A CONTAINER WHICH ROTATES ABOUT AN ESSENTIALLY HORIZONTAL AXIS | [1990/23] | French: | PROCEDE D'EQUILIBRAGE D'UNE ENCEINTE TOURNANT AUTOUR D'UN AXE ESSENTIELLEMENT HORIZONTAL | [1990/23] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.1990 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/23] | 11.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/24] | Request for further processing for: | 10.10.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 10.10.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3117926 (STARR GEORGE N, et al); | [A]GB2080836 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]US4517695 (HOFFMANN ERNST H [DE], et al) |