EP0374232 - METHOD OF FABRICATING AN INFRARED PHOTODETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/26] | BURIED JUNCTION INFRARED PHOTODETECTORS | ||
[1994/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.1995 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.1995 [1995/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Santa Barbara Research Center 75 Coromar Drive Goleta California 93117 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states Santa Barbara Research Center 75 Coromar Drive Goleta California 93117 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COCKRUM, Charles, A. 980 Vereda Del Ciervo Goleta, CA 93117 / US | 02 /
BARTON, Jeffrey, B. 186 Verona Avenue Goleta, CA 93117 / US | 03 /
SCHULTE, Eric, F. 2427 Calle Montilla Santa Barbara, CA 93109 / US | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 89906261.6 | 13.03.1989 | [1990/26] | WO1989US00967 | Priority number, date | US19880178680 | 07.04.1988 Original published format: US 178680 | [1990/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8910007 | Date: | 19.10.1989 | [1989/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0374232 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0374232 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/10, H01L31/18, H01L27/14 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
H01L27/1446 (EP,US);
H01L31/02161 (EP,US);
H01L31/1032 (EP,US);
H01L31/1832 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES INFRAROTPHOTODETEKTORS | [1994/34] | English: | METHOD OF FABRICATING AN INFRARED PHOTODETECTOR | [1994/34] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN PHOTODETECTEUR INFRAROUGE | [1994/34] |
Former [1990/26] | INFRAROTPHOTODETEKTOREN MIT VERGRABENEM ÜBERGANG | ||
Former [1990/26] | BURIED JUNCTION INFRARED PHOTODETECTORS | ||
Former [1990/26] | PHOTODETECTEURS INFRAROUGES A JONCTIONS NOYEES | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.1989 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/26] | 12.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1993 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.08.1993 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | JP5723279 [ ]; | JP5979582 [ ]; | FR2336804 [ ] (TELECOMMUNICATIONS SA [FR]) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 6, No. 87 (E-108) (965), 25 May 1982; & JP-A-5723279 (Fujitsu K.K.) 6 February 1982, & JP5723279 A 19820206 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 8, No. 190 (E-263) (1627), 31 August 1984; & JP-A-5979582 (Fujitsu K.K.) 8 May 1984, & JP5979582 A 19840508 | [ ] - Technical Digest, International Electron Devices Meeting, 4-6 December 1978, IEEE (New York, US), J. AMEURLAINE et al.: "Infrared HgCdTe Photovoltaic Detectors by Planar Technology", pages 430-433 | [ ] - Applied Physics Letters, Vol. 37, No. 5, September 1980, American Institute of Physics (New York, US), M. CHU et al.: "High-Performance Backside-Illuminated Hg0.78CD0.2iTe/CdTe (lambdaco=10mum) Planar Diodes", pages 486-488 | Examination | - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 37, no. 5, September 1980, American Institute of Physics (New York, US) ; M. CHU et al. : "High-performance backside-illuminated Hg0.78Cd0.22Te/CdTe (lambda co = 10mum) planar diodes", pages 486-488. |